City Merchandise Inc. v. Tian Tian Trading Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City Merchandise Inc.
Defendant: Weiwei Lin and Tian Tian Trading Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09649
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 4/13/2020. The case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2019. Deposition due by 2/4/2020. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Motions due by 2/28/2020. Responses due by 3/13/2020. Replies due by 3/23/2020. Oral Argument set for 4/8/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/20/2019) (jwh)
November 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2019, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
November 18, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #8 Complaint. Document filed by Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc..(Schmidt, Curt)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc..(Schmidt, Curt)
November 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curt Donald Schmidt on behalf of Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc.. (Schmidt, Curt)
November 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 11/5/2019, ( Initial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward G. Toptani on behalf of City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Weiwei Lin served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane" Lin. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Tian Tian Trading Inc. served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane" Lin. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Weiwei Lin. (dnh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tian Tian Trading Inc.. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 11-12-2019, AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, N.Y. IN COURTROOM 14-B AT 11:00 am. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/21/2019) (ama)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Weiwei Lin, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tian Tian Trading Inc., re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Toptani, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc.. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.A-CMI NYC Design Products, #2 Exhibit Ex.B-Copyright)(Toptani, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward G. Toptani. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings. (pne)
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Edward G. Toptani to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested was not entered in the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Edward G. Toptani to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Edward G. Toptani to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
October 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne).
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne).
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Toptani, Edward)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne).
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc..(Toptani, Edward)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17797236)Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Baseball Design Products, #2 Exhibit)(Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Merchandise Inc. v. Tian Tian Trading Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weiwei Lin
Represented By: Curt Donald Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tian Tian Trading Inc.
Represented By: Curt Donald Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Merchandise Inc.
Represented By: Edward G. Toptani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?