Tatum-Rios v. Popsugar Inc.
Plaintiff: Lynette Tatum-Rios
Defendant: Popsugar Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09739
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Popsugar Inc.. Document filed by Lynette Tatum-Rios. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Lowe, Christopher)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Popsugar Inc. served on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Lynette Tatum-Rios. (Lipsky, Douglas)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/4/2019) (cf)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Popsugar Inc. waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Document filed by Lynette Tatum-Rios. (Lowe, Christopher)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Popsugar Inc.. (pc)
October 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Popsugar Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lynette Tatum-Rios. (Lipsky, Douglas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lipsky, Douglas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lynette Tatum-Rios. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17809964)Document filed by Lynette Tatum-Rios.(Lipsky, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatum-Rios v. Popsugar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Tatum-Rios
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popsugar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?