O'Neil v. Ratajkowski et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Robert O'Neil
Defendant: Emily Ratajkowski and Emrata Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv09769
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Adam Schnapp on behalf of Emrata Holdings, LLC, Emily Ratajkowski. (Schnapp, Daniel)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Emrata Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020; Emily Ratajkowski waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. Document filed by Robert O'Neil. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/28/2019) (cf)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/28/2019) (cf)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emrata Holdings, LLC. (jgo)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emily Ratajkowski. (jgo)
October 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emrata Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert O'Neil. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Emily Ratajkowski, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert O'Neil. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emrata Holdings, LLC, Emily Ratajkowski. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17817353)Document filed by Robert O'Neil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emrata Holdings, LLC, Emily Ratajkowski. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17817353)Document filed by Robert O'Neil. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neil v. Ratajkowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Ratajkowski
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schnapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emrata Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schnapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert O'Neil
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?