Cruz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alberto Cruz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv09779
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To allow Plaintiff, who is proceeding in forma pauperis, to effect service on Defendant Commissioner of Social Security through the U.S. Marshals Service, the Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons in this action and prepare and forward the necessary papers to the United States Marshal for service of the summons and complaint on the Commissioner of Social Security. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/11/2019) (ras)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (jgo)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/28/2019) (rro)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/28/2019) (rro)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (jgo)
October 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Alberto Cruz.(Berger, Daniel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alberto Cruz. (Berger, Daniel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Berger, Daniel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Alberto Cruz.(Berger, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Cruz
Represented By: Daniel Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?