Lue v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Candice Lue
Defendant: Kimberly Dauber, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Fidelia Shillingford, Baruch Horowitz, Chris Liasis and Michelle Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2019cv09784
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Mailed a copy of #21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, to Candice Liu, 4122 Bel Vista Court, Lodi, New Jersey 07644. (tn)
December 18, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (mro)
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #20 LETTER terminating #19 Motion to Deny request for Pre-Motion Conference. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is hereby advised that a second amended complaint was mistakenly filed on the docket of this case on December 4, 2019. That document has since been deleted from the docket. The Court understands that no second amended complaint has been filed, and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed on October 30, 2019 (Dkt. #4) remains the operative pleading. The Court also notes that a pre-motion conference concerning Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss has been scheduled for February 18, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The clerk of court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 19. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/18/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from C. Lue, dated 12/10/19 re: I, PLAINTIFF CANDACE LUE, DID NOT FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ON 12/4/19 WITH THE COURT -(DOCKET #19). Document filed by Candice Lue.(sc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION FOR JUDGE KATHERINE POLK FAILA TO DENY DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEY ANSHEL KAPLAN'S REQUEST FOR A PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE. Document filed by Candice Lue.(sc) Modified on 12/11/2019 (sc).
December 9, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #19 Amended Complaint. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sc)
December 3, 2019 Mailed a copy of #18 Memo Endorsement, to Candice Liu, 4122 Bel Vista Court, Lodi, New Jersey 07644. (tn)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #17 Letter, filed by Candice Lue. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's application to cancel the pre-motion conference concerning Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss and to require Defendants to file an answer to Plaintiff's amended complaint is DENIED. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, Defendants need not file an answer to the amended complaint before filing a motion to dismiss that complaint. Plaintiff is advised that, should the Court permit Defendants to file a motion to dismiss, the Court will not rule on that motion without permitting Plaintiff an opportunity to oppose it. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/3/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rro)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from C. Lue, dated 11/23/19 re: MOTION TO DENY DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEY ANSHEL KAPLAN'S REQUEST FOR A "PRE-MOTION" CONFERENCE DATED 11/16/19 GOT LOST IN THE MAIL. Document filed by Candice Lue.(sc)
November 25, 2019 Mailed a copy of #16 Order on Motion for Conference, to Candice Liu, 4122 Bel Vista Court, Lodi, New Jersey 07644. (tn)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference, currently scheduled for February 18, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. shall serve as a pre-motion conference concerning Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/22/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rro)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter (ECF No. 12), Notice of Appearance of Anshel Joel Kaplan (ECF No. 13) and Notice of Appearance of Robert S. Whitman (ECF No. 14) served on Candice Lue on November 22, 2019. Document filed by Kimberly Dauber, Baruch Horowitz, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Chris Liasis, Fidelia Shillingford, Michelle Sullivan. (Kaplan, Anshel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert S. Whitman on behalf of Kimberly Dauber, Baruch Horowitz, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Chris Liasis, Fidelia Shillingford, Michelle Sullivan. (Whitman, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anshel Joel Kaplan on behalf of Kimberly Dauber, Baruch Horowitz, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Chris Liasis, Fidelia Shillingford, Michelle Sullivan. (Kaplan, Anshel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Anshel Joel Kaplan dated November 22, 2019 re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) in anticipation of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Anshel Joel Kaplan dated November 14, 2019. . Document filed by Kimberly Dauber, Baruch Horowitz, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Chris Liasis, Fidelia Shillingford, Michelle Sullivan. (Kaplan, Anshel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion (ECF No. 8) served on Candice Lue on November 14, 2019. Document filed by Kimberly Dauber, Baruch Horowitz, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Chris Liasis, Fidelia Shillingford, Michelle Sullivan. (Kaplan, Anshel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEY ANSHEL KAPLAN'S LETTER MOTION-(DOCKET #8), re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) in anticipation of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Anshel Joel Kaplan dated November 14, 2019. Document filed by Candice Lue. (sc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co..(Kaplan, Anshel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) in anticipation of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Anshel Joel Kaplan dated November 14, 2019. Document filed by Kimberly Dauber, Baruch Horowitz, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Chris Liasis, Fidelia Shillingford, Michelle Sullivan.(Kaplan, Anshel)
November 14, 2019 Mailed a copy of #7 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Candice Lue 4122 Bel Vista Court Lodi, NJ 07644. (aea)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/13/2019) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 11/14/2019 (va).
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Robert Whitman, Esq. and Anshel Kaplan, Esq. at Seyfarth Shaw LLP. Document filed by Candice Lue. (sc)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DEFAMATION; COMMONLAW CONSPIRACY; FALSE & FRAUDULENT ACTS & CONDUCT; ACTUAL MALICE; LIBEL; DEFAMATION PER SE; DEFAMATION BY IMPLICATION, re: amending #1 Complaint against Kimberly Dauber, Baruch Horowitz, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Chris Liasis, Fidelia Shillingford, Michelle Sullivan with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Candice Lue. Related document: #1 Complaint.(sc)
October 23, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kimberly Dauber, Baruch Horowitz, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Chris Liasis, Fidelia Shillingford, Michelle Sullivan. (sac)
October 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac)
October 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Candice Lue. (sac)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kimberly Dauber, Baruch Horowitz, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Alex Khavin, Chris Liasis, Fidelia Shillingford, Michelle Sullivan. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 465401246837) Document filed by Candice Lue.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lue v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Dauber
Represented By: Anshel Joel Kaplan
Represented By: Robert S. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Anshel Joel Kaplan
Represented By: Robert S. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Khavin
Represented By: Anshel Joel Kaplan
Represented By: Robert S. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelia Shillingford
Represented By: Anshel Joel Kaplan
Represented By: Robert S. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baruch Horowitz
Represented By: Anshel Joel Kaplan
Represented By: Robert S. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Liasis
Represented By: Anshel Joel Kaplan
Represented By: Robert S. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Sullivan
Represented By: Anshel Joel Kaplan
Represented By: Robert S. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Lue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?