Franco v. LTS Century Building LLC et al
Plaintiff: Milagros Franco
Defendant: LTS Century Building LLC, Barnes & Noble, Inc. and Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09846
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. LTS Century Building LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Milagros Franco. (Hanski, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Barnes & Noble, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Milagros Franco. (Hanski, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Milagros Franco. (Hanski, Robert)
October 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Gerald Hanski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (pne)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LTS Century Building LLC. (pne)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barnes & Noble, Inc.. (pne)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc.. (pne)
October 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LTS Century Building, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Milagros Franco. (Hanski, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barnes & Noble, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Milagros Franco. (Hanski, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Milagros Franco. (Hanski, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hanski, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., LTS Century Building LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17830238)Document filed by Milagros Franco.(Hanski, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franco v. LTS Century Building LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTS Century Building LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milagros Franco
Represented By: Robert Gerald Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?