Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. et al v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration et al
Plaintiff: Environmental Working Group, Environmental Defense Fund, Breast Cancer Prevention Partners, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety and Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Defendant: Norman E. Sharpless, Food and Drug Administration and U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv10005
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. Norman E. Sharpless served on 11/13/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; U.S. Food and Drug Administration served on 11/13/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Daly, Gabriel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Center for Food Safety.(Talbott, Ryan)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Ryan D. Talbott to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
November 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Ryan D. Talbott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18085260. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Ryan D. Talbott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18085260. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan Talbott, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Talbott, Ryan) Modified on 11/18/2019 (wb).
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Carrie Faye Apfel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
November 5, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Carrie Faye Apfel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17898005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Carrie Faye Apfel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17898005. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Breast Cancer Prevention Partners, Center for Environmental Health, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Working Group.(Apfel, Carrie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Norman E. Sharpless, U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (pc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Environmental Working Group.(Andiman, Alexis)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Environmental Defense Fund.(Andiman, Alexis)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Center for Environmental Health.(Andiman, Alexis)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Breast Cancer Prevention Partners.(Andiman, Alexis)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Food and Drug Administration; Norman E. Sharpless, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Breast Cancer Prevention Partners, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Working Group, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Daly, Gabriel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Daly, Gabriel)
October 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gabriel Jackson Daly to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption. If all of the party names do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gabriel Jackson Daly. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Food and Drug Administration; Norman E. Sharpless. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
October 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gabriel Jackson Daly to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption. If all of the party names do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexis Charlotte Andiman on behalf of Breast Cancer Prevention Partners, Center for Environmental Health, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Working Group. (Andiman, Alexis)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Daly, Gabriel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Food and Drug Administration; Norman E. Sharpless, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Breast Cancer Prevention Partners, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Working Group, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Daly, Gabriel) Modified on 10/30/2019 (jgo).
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Daly, Gabriel) Modified on 10/30/2019 (jgo).
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Food and Drug Administration, Norman E. Sharpless. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17852663)Document filed by Environmental Working Group, Center for Environmental Health, Breast Cancer Prevention Partners, Center for Food Safety, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Environmental Defense Fund.(Daly, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. et al v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Working Group
Represented By: Alexis Charlotte Andiman
Represented By: Carrie Apfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Alexis Charlotte Andiman
Represented By: Carrie Apfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breast Cancer Prevention Partners
Represented By: Alexis Charlotte Andiman
Represented By: Carrie Apfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Alexis Charlotte Andiman
Represented By: Carrie Apfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Ryan D. Talbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel Jackson Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman E. Sharpless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?