Padilla v. Sacks and Sacks, LLP et al
Plaintiff: LISA J PADILLA and Lisa J. Padilla
Defendant: KENNETH SACKS, DEVON REIFF, EVAN SACKS, SACKS and SACKS LLP and Sacks and Sacks, LLP
Case Number: 1:2019cv10021
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Dirk C. Haarhoff dated December 20, 2019. Document filed by Devon Reiff, Evan Sacks, Kenneth Sacks, Sacks and Sacks, LLP.(Haarhoff, Dirk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dirk Calache Haarhoff on behalf of Devon Reiff, Evan Sacks, Kenneth Sacks, Sacks and Sacks, LLP. (Haarhoff, Dirk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/1/2019) (kv)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Devon Reiff, Evan Sacks, Kenneth Sacks, Sacks and Sacks, LLP. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SACKS AND SACKS LLP, KENNETH SACKS, EVAN SACKS AND DEVON REIFF, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Lisa J. Padilla. (Walshe, John)
October 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Walshe. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lisa J. Padilla, Sacks and Sacks, LLP, Kenneth Sacks, Evan Sacks, Devon Reiff. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Walshe, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Walshe, John) Modified on 10/30/2019 (jgo).
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Devon Reiff, Evan Sacks, Kenneth Sacks, Sacks and Sacks, LLP. Document filed by Lisa J. Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgement, #3 Exhibit B - Rebuttal)(Walshe, John)
October 30, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17855257, paid on 10/29/2019. (pne)
October 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney John Walshe. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
October 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Walshe to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by LISA J PADILLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgement, #3 Exhibit B - Rebuttal)(Walshe, John) Modified on 10/30/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Sacks and Sacks, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH SACKS
Represented By: Dirk Calache Haarhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVON REIFF
Represented By: Dirk Calache Haarhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVAN SACKS
Represented By: Dirk Calache Haarhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SACKS and SACKS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacks and Sacks, LLP
Represented By: Dirk Calache Haarhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA J PADILLA
Represented By: John Walshe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa J. Padilla
Represented By: John Walshe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?