Jones et al v. NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Rose and Seymour Jones
Defendant: Thomas Auringer and NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10043
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 1/21/2020.(mf)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/16/2019. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/23/2019) (mf)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Thomas Auringer served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. Service was accepted by Authorized Employee. Document filed by Seymour Jones; Kenneth Rose. (Hassan, Abdul)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas Auringer, NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC.(Donovan, Joseph)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC.(Donovan, Joseph)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. Service was accepted by NY Secretary of State. Document filed by Seymour Jones; Kenneth Rose. (Hassan, Abdul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Auringer, NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC. (jgo)
October 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hassan, Abdul)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC, and Thomas Auringer, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Seymour Jones, Kenneth Rose. (Hassan, Abdul)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Auringer, NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17858727)Document filed by Seymour Jones, Kenneth Rose.(Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Rose
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seymour Jones
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Auringer
Represented By: Joseph Ted Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Crane Hoist & Rigging, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Ted Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?