Bloom et al v. Emden et al
Plaintiff: Fiduciary Trust Company International and Susan F. Bloom
Defendant: Nicholas Marcelo Emden, Juan Carlos Emden and Miguel Eric Emden
Case Number: 1:2019cv10155
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas M. O'Donnell in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Juan Carlos Emden, Miguel Eric Emden, Nicholas Marcelo Emden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(O'Donnell, Nicholas)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Juan Carlos Emden, Miguel Eric Emden, Nicholas Marcelo Emden. (O'Donnell, Nicholas)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Juan Carlos Emden, Miguel Eric Emden, Nicholas Marcelo Emden. Responses due by 1/3/2020(O'Donnell, Nicholas)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Michael O'Donnell on behalf of Juan Carlos Emden, Miguel Eric Emden, Nicholas Marcelo Emden. (O'Donnell, Nicholas)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Susan F. Bloom, Fiduciary Trust Company International. (Winter, John)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Susan F. Bloom, Fiduciary Trust Company International. (Winter, John)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Susan F. Bloom, Fiduciary Trust Company International. (Winter, John)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter filed by Susan F. Bloom, Fiduciary Trust Company International. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule. The Court shall hold a conference on February 27, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. with respect to these matters. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/13/2019., Responses due by 1/3/2020, Replies due by 1/17/2020., Status Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/12/2019) (kv)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from John D. Winter dated November 8, 2019 re: parties' proposed case schedule. Document filed by Susan F. Bloom, Fiduciary Trust Company International.(Winter, John)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Winter, John)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nicholas Marcelo Emden. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miguel Eric Emden. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Juan Carlos Emden. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John D. Winter to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection; Citizenship Plaintiff code - multiple selections;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicholas Marcelo Emden, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Susan F. Bloom, Fiduciary Trust Company International. (Winter, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miguel Eric Emden, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Susan F. Bloom, Fiduciary Trust Company International. (Winter, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Juan Carlos Emden, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Susan F. Bloom, Fiduciary Trust Company International. (Winter, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Franklin Resources, Inc. for Fiduciary Trust Company International. Document filed by Fiduciary Trust Company International.(Winter, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Winter, John) Modified on 11/4/2019 (jgo).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juan Carlos Emden, Miguel Eric Emden, Nicholas Marcelo Emden. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17876045)Document filed by Susan F. Bloom, Fiduciary Trust Company International. (Attachments: #1 A.Image of Claude Monets Le Palais Ducal, #2 B.Glossary of Key Participants, #3 C.Last Will and Testament of Adele Klapper, #4 D.Timeline of Key Events Regarding the Acquisition and Disposition of the Painting, #5 E.Provenance, #6 F.Ticino Certificate of Inheritance, #7 G.Private Schtze: ber das Sammeln von Kunst in Hamburg bis 1933, #8 H.Hamburg Landgericht JTC Claims Z14165, Schloicka Statement, 1952, #9 I.U.S. Embassy Santiago, Chile, Airgram, #10 J.Bill of Sale of the Painting, April 10, 1942, #11 K.Walter Feilchenfeldt, Jr., Statement to Dirk Boll, October 10, 2018, #12 L.Letter from Walter Feilchenfeldt to Paul Rosenberg, #13 M.Emil G. Buehrle Collection statement on Monets Poppy Field near Vtheuil, #14 N.Censorship intercept: Olga Ammann to Hans Erich Emden, #15 O.Foreign Investigations Unit, Memorandum for the Files, #16 P.U.S. Department of the Treasury, Foreign Funds Control Department, #17 Q.U.S. Embassy Santiago, Chile, Despatch, #18 R.U.S. Department of the Treasury, Foreign Funds Control Department, #19 S.Marcel Gyr, Bhrle Foundation Presents New Documents, #20 T.Thomas F. Schneider and Inge Jaehner with Walter M. Feilchenfeldt and Suzanne Schwarz Zuber, Remarques Impressionisten: Kunstsammeln und Kunsthandel im Exil Remarques Impressionists, #21 U.Erich Maria Remarque, Das Unbekannte Werk: Frhe Prosa, Werke aus dem Nachlass, Briefe und Tagebcher, #22 V.I misteri delle Isole di Brissago, #23 W.Daniel Wildenstein, Monet: Catalogue Raisonn / Werkverzeichnis, #24 X.Daniel Wildenstein, Monet: Biographie et Catalogue Raisonn, #25 Y.Letter from Tom Kline to Juan Carlos Emden, October 1, 2018, #26 Z.Email from Juan Carlos Emden to Tom Kline, October 3, 2018, #27 AA.Email from Juan Carlos Emden to Monica Dugot of Christies, October 2, 2018, #28 BB.Email from Juan Carlos Emden to Monica Dugot of Christies, October 4, 2018, #29 CC.Email from Juan Carlos Emden to Monica Dugot of Christies, October 18, 2018, #30 DD.Email from Juan Carlos Emden to Lucian Simmons of Sothebys, October 18, 2018, #31 EE.Letter from Jo Backer Laird to Markus Stoetzel and Mel Urbach Regarding the Painting, January 18, 2019, #32 FF.Expert Report of Dr. Thomas Buomberger, Winterthur, Switzerland, on behalf of Juan Carlos Emden, Santiago de Chile, Chile, January 17, 2019, #33 GG.Email from Markus Stoetzel to Jo Backer Laird and Tom Kline, March 15, 2019, #34 HH.Email from Markus Stoetzel to Tom Kline, February 21, 2019, #35 II.Email from Juan Carlos Emden to Monica Dugot of Christies, April 22, 2019, #36 JJ.Email from Juan Carlos Emden to Monica Dugot of Christies, May 3, 2019, #37 Certification of Translation)(Winter, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloom et al v. Emden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiduciary Trust Company International
Represented By: John D. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan F. Bloom
Represented By: John D. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Marcelo Emden
Represented By: Nicholas Michael O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Carlos Emden
Represented By: Nicholas Michael O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Eric Emden
Represented By: Nicholas Michael O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?