Dahbi v. U.S. Department of Homeland Secuirty et al
Plaintiff: Taoufik Dahbi
Defendant: Director Christopher A. Wray, DIRECTOR USCIS KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, New York District USCIS, Acting Director John P Sanders, Department of Homeland Secuirty, William Barr United States Attorney General, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ken Cuccinelli, Christopher Wray, John P Sanders and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv10163
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/11/2019) (cf)
November 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Nakajima on behalf of William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, John P Sanders, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Christopher Wray. (Nakajima, Simon)
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WILLIAM BARR, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U. S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U. S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad)
November 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mohammad Ali Syed to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name does not exactly match pleading caption on the 'as to' docket entry text and the PDF 'To' section (Doc. 5 and Doc. 11); second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o' or 'via' (Doc. 5, 6, 10, 11);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ken Cuccinelli. (jgo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John P Sanders. (jgo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Wray. (jgo)
November 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mohammad Ali Syed. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Orange;. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US ATTORNEY, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jgo).
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jgo).
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHRISTOPHER WRAY, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JOHN P. SANDERS, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KEN CUCCINELLI, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WILLIAM BARR, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jgo).
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, re: #3 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Syed, Mohammad) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jgo).
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Syed, Mohammad)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, John P Sanders, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Christopher Wray.Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Syed, Mohammad)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mohammad Ali Syed to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each summons request must be filed separately OR one summons request may be filed with a 'rider' attached listing all of the party names and addresses; party names on the 'as to' docket entry text does not exactly match initial pleading caption. Party names must not be abbreviated; the form used for the summons is blank for all of the summons except the first one. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Mohammad Ali Syed to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mohammad Ali Syed. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Department of Homeland Security; William Barr; Ken Cuccinelli; John P Sanders; Christopher Wray; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mohammad Ali Syed to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 11/12/2019. (jgo)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DHS, USCIS, Barr, Cuccinelli, Berman USAO, Sanders, Wray, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Attachments: #1 Summons to ISSUE DHS, #2 Summons FBI, #3 Summons Barr, #4 Summons Quintana, #5 Summons Cucinneli, #6 Summons Sanders, #7 Summons Berman)(Syed, Mohammad) Modified on 11/4/2019 (jgo).
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, Department of Homeland Secuirty, John P Sanders, USCIS, United States Attorney General, Christopher A. Wray. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17877464)Document filed by Taoufik Dahbi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Syed, Mohammad) Modified on 11/4/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahbi v. U.S. Department of Homeland Secuirty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR USCIS KENNETH T CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York District USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director John P Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Secuirty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Sanders
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taoufik Dahbi
Represented By: Mohammad Ali Syed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?