Bowcock v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: John Bowcock
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company and Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv10224
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court, at the time and place listed below. If any defendant has not appeared by counsel, plaintiff's counsel must forthwith send a copy of this notice to any unrepresented party. Date and place of conference : January 22, 2020 at 2:45 pm at the United States Court House, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 21A. Attorneys are directed to consult this Court's Indi victual Practices with respect to communications with Chambers, adjournments, motions and related matters. And as set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/12/2019) (ama)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Mehnert, Vincent)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, that the time for Defendant, THE LONG ISLAND RAIL ROAD COMPANY, ("LIRR"), to answer, amend or supplement the Answer or to make any motion with relation to the Complaint of plaintiff be and the same hereby is extended through and including December 20, 2019. Long Island Railroad Company answer due 12/20/2019. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/21/2019) (mro)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Christopher P. Yodice dated November 21, 2019. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company. Return Date set for 12/20/2019 at 09:00 AM.(Yodice, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. Long Island Railroad Company served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service was accepted by Vivian Oliver-Taylor. Document filed by John Bowcock. (Gold, Fredric)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Fredric M. Gold. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Long Island Railroad Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Fredric M. Gold. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Bowcock. (Gold, Fredric)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gold, Fredric)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17889047)Document filed by John Bowcock.(Gold, Fredric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowcock v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bowcock
Represented By: Fredric M. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Represented By: Vincent John Mehnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?