The Minz Fraade Law Firm, P.C. v. Brady et al
Plaintiff: The Minz Fraade Law Firm, P.C.
Defendant: Frank Brady and Life's Time Capsule Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10236
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases served on The Mintz Fraade Law Firm, P.C. on December 17, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Frank Brady, Life's Time Capsule Services, Inc.. (Saponara, David)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on January 22, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Within two business days of the date of this Order, Defendants are directed to serve on Plaintiff a copy of this Order and of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, and to file proof of such service on the docket. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to file a notice of appearance on the docket within two business days of such service and as further set forth in this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/17/19) (yv)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The answer deadline is hereby extended to January 15, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Paul H. Aloe dated December 16, 2019. Document filed by Frank Brady, Life's Time Capsule Services, Inc..(Aloe, Paul)
November 24, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Frank Brady, Life's Time Capsule Services, Inc.. Document filed by The Minz Fraade Law Firm, P.C..(Kramer, Edward)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul H. Aloe. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $240,910,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $241,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
November 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal served on The Mintz Fraade Law Firm, P.C. on 11/4/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Frank Brady, Life's Time Capsule Services, Inc.. (Saponara, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Nicholas Saponara on behalf of Frank Brady, Life's Time Capsule Services, Inc.. (Saponara, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Aloe, Paul)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 655068/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17891092).Document filed by Life's Time Capsule Services, Inc., Frank Brady. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleading)(Aloe, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Minz Fraade Law Firm, P.C. v. Brady et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Brady
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe
Represented By: David Nicholas Saponara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life's Time Capsule Services, Inc.
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe
Represented By: David Nicholas Saponara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Minz Fraade Law Firm, P.C.
Represented By: Edward Calvin Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?