Verch v. The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Defendant: The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation and Dun & Bradstreet Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv10257
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: In addition, it having been reported to this Court that this case has been or will be settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/20/2019) (va)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: In addition, it having been reported to this Court that this case has been or will be settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/20/2019) (va)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Thomas B. Sullivan dated December 19, 2019 re: Settlement in Principle and Request For 30-Day Order. Document filed by Dun & Bradstreet Corporation.(Sullivan, Thomas)
November 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dun & Bradstreet Corporation answer due 1/10/2020. (rro)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/22/2019) (rro)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Thomas B. Sullivan dated November 21, 2019. Document filed by Dun & Bradstreet Corporation.(Sullivan, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Byrne Sullivan on behalf of Dun & Bradstreet Corporation. (Sullivan, Thomas)
November 17, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dun & Bradstreet Corporation served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. Document filed by Marco Verch. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dun & Bradstreet Corporation. (dnh)
November 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Liebowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marco Verch. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-17894142)Document filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verch v. The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dun & Bradstreet Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Byrne Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?