Delacruz v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emanuel Delacruz
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10319
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended to February 5, 2020, on consent. As Judge Swain has referred this case to me for general pretrial supervision, all further pretrial-related applications should be directed to me. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close Docket Number 10 and mark it as granted. SO ORDERED. (Ruby Tuesday, Inc. answer due 2/5/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 12/20/19) (yv)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Motions referred to James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/20/2019) (mro)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from David J. Ranzenhofer dated December 20, 2019. Document filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc..(Ranzenhofer, David)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The request is Granted. This resolves DE # 8. SO ORDERED. Ruby Tuesday, Inc. answer due 1/6/2020. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/27/2019) (ama)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from David J. Ranzenhofer dated November 26, 2019. Document filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc..(Ranzenhofer, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc..(Ranzenhofer, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Joseph Ranzenhofer on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Ranzenhofer, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ruby Tuesday, Inc. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. Service was accepted by Jonathan Roberts, authorized agent. Document filed by Emanuel Delacruz. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (pc)
November 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Emanuel Delacruz. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17908084)Document filed by Emanuel Delacruz.(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delacruz v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Delacruz
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: David Joseph Ranzenhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?