Dunn v. Downstate Correctional Facility/Dept. of Corrections
Plaintiff: Mr. Robert L. Dunn, Sr.
Defendant: Downstate Correctional Facility/Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2019cv10384
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:19-cv-06085. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. So Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/4/2019. (Almonte, Giselle) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. No summons shall issue from this Court. A decision on plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauper is is reserved for the transferee court. That provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York which requires a seven-day delay is waived. The Clerk of Court is also respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to Dunn and to note that mailing on the docket. So Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/4/2019. (Almonte, Giselle) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert L. Dunn, Sr. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Downstate Correctional Facility/Dept. of Corrections, filed by Robert L. Dunn, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2019: #2 Exhibit Letter) (Bowens, Priscilla). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Downstate Correctional Facility/Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Robert L. Dunn, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downstate Correctional Facility/Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?