Guglielmo v. W. W. Grainger, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Guglielmo
Defendant: W. W. Grainger, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10399
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by Joseph Guglielmo. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION DENIED. Counsel for Plain7ff shall, by January 8, 2020, file a mo7on to withdraw in compliance with S.D.N.Y. Local Rule 1.4. (Motions due by 1/8/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/24/2019) (jca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Russel Weinrib, New Attorney: David P. Force, Address: Stein Saks, PLLC, 285 Passaic St., Hackensack, New Jersey, United States 07601, 2012826500. Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo. (Force, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Russel Weinrib, New Attorney: David P. Force, Address: Stein Saks, PLLC, 285 Passaic St., Hackensack, New Jersey, United States 07601, 2012826500. Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo. (Force, David)
December 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: W. W. Grainger, Inc. answer due 1/13/2020. (cf)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is adjourned to January 13, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/12/2019) (cf)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael F. Fleming dated December 11, 2019. Document filed by W. W. Grainger, Inc..(Fleming, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of W. W. Grainger, Inc.. (Fleming, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas T. Schwarz on behalf of W. W. Grainger, Inc.. (Schwarz, Douglas)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/14/2019) (cf)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to W. W. Grainger, Inc.. (jgo)
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to W. W. Grainger, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo. (Weinrib, Russel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weinrib, Russel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W. W. Grainger, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17954311)Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo.(Weinrib, Russel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guglielmo v. W. W. Grainger, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. W. Grainger, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas T. Schwarz
Represented By: Michael Friel Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Guglielmo
Represented By: Russel Craig Weinrib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?