The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Vema Group, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: 1790 Broadway Associates, LLC, Vema Group, LLC and Goodhope Managment Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10400
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Jurisdiction is invoked pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. The complaint fails adequately to allege the existence of subject matter jurisdiction because, perhaps among other things, it fails adequately to allege: The citizenship of one or more limited liability companies. See Handlesman v. Bedford Village Green Assocs. L.P., 213 F.3d 48, 52 (2d Cir. 2000). Absent the filing, on or before 11/25/19 of an amended complaint adequately alleging the existence of subject matter jurisdiction, the action will be dismissed or, if removed, remanded. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2019.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/18/2019) (jca)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vema Group, LLC. (dnh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1790 Broadway Associates, LLC. (dnh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goodhope Managment Corp.. (dnh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vema Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Smith, Kevin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1790 Broadway Associates, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Smith, Kevin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goodhope Managment Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Smith, Kevin)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Smith, Kevin)
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kevin P. Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin P. Smith. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 07:1; Jury Demand code n (None); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kevin P. Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Office was not selected. Citizenship of principal parties were not selected. (pc)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin P. Smith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 1790 Broadway Associates, LLC, Goodhope Managment Corp., Vema Group, The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Smith, Kevin) Modified on 11/12/2019 (pc).
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Smith, Kevin) Modified on 11/12/2019 (pc).
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1790 Broadway Associates, LLC, Goodhope Managment Corp., Vema Group. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17954574)Document filed by The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Smith, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Vema Group, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1790 Broadway Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vema Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodhope Managment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Kevin P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?