Calcano v. Lululemon USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Marcos Calcano
Defendant: Lululemon USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10430
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Lululemon USA Inc. answer due 1/20/2020. (ks)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/4/2019) (ks)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Katharine J. Liao dated 12/3/2019. Document filed by Lululemon USA Inc..(Liao, Katharine)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/19/2019) (jca)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lululemon USA Inc. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Souky, authorized agent, NYS Sect. of State. Document filed by Marcos Calcano. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lululemon USA Inc.. (pne)
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lululemon USA Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcos Calcano. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lululemon USA Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17960228)Document filed by Marcos Calcano.(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calcano v. Lululemon USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Calcano
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lululemon USA Inc.
Represented By: Katharine Liao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?