Major Energy Electric Services, LLC et al v. Horowitz et al
Plaintiff: Major Energy Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC and Respond Power, LLC
Defendant: Michael Baumann, Mark Wiederman, Saul Horowitz, Mark Josefovic and Asher Fried
Case Number: 1:2019cv10431
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS AND SCHEDULE OF PROCEEDINGS: Defendants shall move to dismiss the Complaint in accordance with the following schedule agreed to by the parties: Motions due by 1/29/2020., Responses due by 2/26/2020, Replies due by 3/11/2020. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/23/2019) (ama)
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Troy S. Brown dated December 12, 2019 re: #15 LETTER MOTION for Conference specifically a pre-motion conference and/or allow the Defendants to file a Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Israel Dahan dated 12/9//2019. . Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, Major Energy Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Respond Power, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC. (Brown, Troy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Conference specifically a pre-motion conference and/or allow the Defendants to file a Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Israel Dahan dated 12/9//2019. Document filed by Michael Baumann, Asher Fried, Saul Horowitz(individually), Saul Horowitz(as Sellers' Representative), Mark Josefovic, Mark Wiederman.(Dahan, Israel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Michael Baumann, Asher Fried, Saul Horowitz(individually), Saul Horowitz(as Sellers' Representative), Mark Josefovic, Mark Wiederman. (Dahan, Israel)
November 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 20, 2019 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to J Paul Oetken and declined by Judge 17cv7742 and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Saul Horowitz(individually), Saul Horowitz(as Sellers' Representative). (pne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Baumann. (pne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Wiederman. (pne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Josefovic. (pne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Asher Fried. (pne)
November 12, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Michael Baumann, Asher Fried, Saul Horowitz, Mark Josefovic, Mark Wiederman, Saul Horowitz added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Respond Power, LLC, Major Energy Services, LLC, Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Brown, Troy)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Troy S. Brown re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Saul Horowitz must be added to the case a second time, with party text "as Sellers' Representative". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Troy S. Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $300,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3,300,000. (pne)
November 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge J. Paul Oetken as possibly related to 17CV7742. (pne)
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-cv-07742-JPO. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, Major Energy Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Respond Power, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC.(Brown, Troy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Josefovic, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, Major Energy Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Respond Power, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC. (Brown, Troy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Bauman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, Major Energy Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Respond Power, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC. (Brown, Troy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Asher Fried, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, Major Energy Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Respond Power, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC. (Brown, Troy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Wiederman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, Major Energy Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Respond Power, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC. (Brown, Troy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Saul Horowitz, individually and as Sellers' Representative, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, Major Energy Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Respond Power, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC. (Brown, Troy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brown, Troy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Baumann, Asher Fried, Saul Horowitz, Mark Josefovic, Mark Wiederman. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17960774)Document filed by Respond Power, LLC, Major Energy Services, LLC, Major Energy Electric Services, LLC, National Gas & Electric, LLC, Spark HoldCo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Brown, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Major Energy Electric Services, LLC et al v. Horowitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Baumann
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wiederman
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Horowitz
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Josefovic
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asher Fried
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Gas & Electric, LLC
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Energy Electric Services, LLC
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spark HoldCo, LLC
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Respond Power, LLC
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?