Bryant v. Indyke et al
Plaintiff: Juliette Bryant
Defendant: Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn
Case Number: 1:2019cv10479
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Debra C Freeman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Joshua I. Schiller and Bennet J. Moskowitz dated January 10, 2020 re: Status Update. Document filed by Juliette Bryant.(Schiller, Joshua)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Sigrid S. McCawley, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 12/27/19) (yv)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Motions referred to Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/26/2019) (kv)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Darren K. Indyke waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020; Richard D. Kahn waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. Document filed by Juliette Bryant. (Schiller, Joshua)
November 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18120757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18120757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Juliette Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sigrid S. McCawley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McCawley, Sigrid)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Boies, II on behalf of Juliette Bryant. (Boies, David)
November 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so redesignated. (wb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Darren K. Indyke, Richard D. Kahn. (pc)
November 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Juliette Bryant. (Schiller, Joshua)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schiller, Joshua)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darren K. Indyke, Richard D. Kahn. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18065672)Document filed by Juliette Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schiller, Joshua)
November 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joshua Schiller. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
November 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Schiller to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/18/2019. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Indyke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren K. Indyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliette Bryant
Represented By: Sigrid S. McCawley
Represented By: Joshua Schiller
Represented By: David Boies, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?