R. v. Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield et al
Plaintiff: Deck R.
Defendant: Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2019cv10490
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield. (dnh)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, re: #7 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Deck R.. (Hess, Jennifer)
December 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jennifer Lynn Hess to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, re: #7 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Deck R.. (Hess, Jennifer) Modified on 12/26/2019 (jgo).
December 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jennifer Lynn Hess to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; party name/names on the docket entry text must match party name/names in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF; remove "Does 1 through 10" from the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HIGHMARK BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD; and DOES 1 through 10, re: #7 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Deck R.. (Hess, Jennifer) Modified on 12/26/2019 (pne).
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Does 1 through 10, Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield.Document filed by Deck R.. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Hess, Jennifer)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lynn Hess on behalf of Deck R.. (Hess, Jennifer)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/19/2019) (jca)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deck R.. (Riemer, Scott)
November 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
November 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Riemer, Scott)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10, Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18042768)Document filed by Deck R..(Riemer, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. v. Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deck R.
Represented By: Scott Madison Riemer
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?