O'Rourke v. 339 West 44 Realty LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher O'Rourke
Defendant: 339 West 44 W. Food LLC, Alan Rodriguez and 339 West 44 Realty LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10502
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 339 West 44 Realty LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Refused Name, Authorized to Accept. Document filed by Christopher O'Rourke. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Alan Rodriguez served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service was accepted by Kevin Balbuena, Suitable Age Person. Document filed by Christopher O'Rourke. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 339 West 44 W. Food LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service was accepted by Kevin Balbuena, Manager. Document filed by Christopher O'Rourke. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled (by separate Order to be entered today) for February 11, 2020, at 4:15 p.m. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/25/2019. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/13/2019) (kv)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases of this nature often benefit from early mediation. To that end, by separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/13/2019) (kv)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 339 West 44 W. Food LLC. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alan Rodriguez. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 339 West 44 Realty LLC. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Hector V. Ramirez. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alan Rodriguez, 339 West 44 W. Food LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted; alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 339 West 44 W. Food LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher O'Rourke. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alan Rodriguez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher O'Rourke. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 339 West 44 Realty LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher O'Rourke. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 339 West 44 Realty LLC, 339 West 44 W. Food LLC, Alan Rodriguez. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18044825)Document filed by Christopher O'Rourke.(Ramirez, Hector)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Rourke v. 339 West 44 Realty LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 339 West 44 W. Food LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 339 West 44 Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher O'Rourke
Represented By: Hector V. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?