Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. The Outfit M&J LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York and Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Defendant: Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland and The Outfit M&J LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10515
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING GENERAL PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). All pretrial motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and discovery (but excluding motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, for injunctive relief, for summary judgment, or for class certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23) must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. All discovery must be initiated in time to be concluded by the close of discovery set by the Court. Counsel for the plaintiff must serve a copy of this Order on any defendant previously served with the summons and complaint, must serve this Order along with the summons and complaint on all defendants served hereafter, and must file proof of such service with the Court. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/10/2020) (ama)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/10/2020) (ama)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The request is Granted. This resolves DE # 9. Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland answer due 1/31/2020. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/09/2020) (ama)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Breidenbach on behalf of Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland. (Breidenbach, Catherine)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Steven Gamell on behalf of Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland. (Gamell, Mark)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 31, 2020 addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Catherine Breidenbach dated January 8, 2020. Document filed by Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland.(Gamell, Mark)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint, served. Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service was accepted by New York State Department of Financial Services. Document filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Grancio, Adrianna)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. The Outfit M&J LLC served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the Corporate Division of the Department of State and empowered to receive such service. Document filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Grancio, Adrianna)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland, The Outfit M&J LLC. (jgo)
November 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adrianna Grancio on behalf of The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. (Grancio, Adrianna)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund.(Marimon, Nicole)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Outfit M&J LLC, and Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. (Marimon, Nicole)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marimon, Nicole)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland, The Outfit M&J LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18049419)Document filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund.(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. The Outfit M&J LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Represented By: Adrianna Grancio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Represented By: Adrianna Grancio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Represented By: Adrianna Grancio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Catherine Breidenbach
Represented By: Mark Steven Gamell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Outfit M&J LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?