Johnson v. Classic Material NY, LLC
Plaintiff: Eric Johnson
Defendant: Classic Material NY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10529
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference (Dkt. 9) and Individual Practices in Civil Cases of Alison J. Nathan, U.S. District Judge served on Classic Material NY, LLC on December 23, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Eric Johnson. (Malbin, Alexander)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/20/2019) (kv)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Classic Material NY, LLC. (dnh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Classic Material NY, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Johnson. (Malbin, Alexander)
November 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander Rudolf Malbin to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Classic Material NY, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Johnson. (Malbin, Alexander) Modified on 11/14/2019 (jgo).
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Eric Johnson.(Malbin, Alexander)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Malbin, Alexander)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Malbin, Alexander)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Classic Material NY, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18050249)Document filed by Eric Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Malbin, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Classic Material NY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Material NY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Johnson
Represented By: Alexander Rudolf Malbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?