Gainous v. Saul
Plaintiff: Joshua Gainous
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv10599
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Referring Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: The above-referenced social security action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Moses for Report and Recommendation. All motions and applications, including those related to scheduling, and all motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-barbara-moses; as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/7/2020) (mro)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/3/2020) (jca) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/3/2020) (jca). Modified on 1/3/2020 (jca).
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Joshua Gainous. (Hor, Albert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul. (dnh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew M. Saul, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Gainous. (Hor, Albert)
December 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Albert Hor to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the party name listed in the as to docket must exactly match the party of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/10/2019) (va)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hor, Albert)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (jgo)
November 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Albert Hor to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to saul, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Gainous. (Hor, Albert) Modified on 12/11/2019 (dnh).
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Joshua Gainous.(Hor, Albert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hor, Albert) Modified on 11/18/2019 (jgo).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. Document filed by Joshua Gainous. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hor, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gainous v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Gainous
Represented By: Albert Hor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?