Licheli et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Ksenia Nebunishvili, Makvala Licheli and George Nebunishvili
Defendant: Acting Director KEN CUCCINELLI, Director Christopher A. Wray, Associate Director DONALD NEUFELD, Director Robert M. Cowan, Special Agent Michael J Driscoll, District Director THOMAS CIOPPA, US Attorney General William Barr, Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan, Michael J Driscoll, Robert M. Cowan, Thomas Cioppa, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr, Donald Neufeld and Christopher A. Wray
Case Number: 1:2019cv10621
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. William Barr answer due 1/28/2020; Thomas Cioppa answer due 1/28/2020; Robert M. Cowan answer due 1/28/2020; Ken Cuccinelli answer due 1/28/2020; Michael J Driscoll answer due 1/28/2020; Kevin McAleenan answer due 1/28/2020; Donald Neufeld answer due 1/28/2020; Christopher A. Wray answer due 1/28/2020. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/10/2019) (jca)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Simon Nakajima dated December 4, 2019. Document filed by William Barr, Thomas Cioppa, Robert M. Cowan, Ken Cuccinelli, Michael J Driscoll, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Neufeld, Christopher A. Wray.(Nakajima, Simon)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Nakajima on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Cioppa, Robert M. Cowan, Ken Cuccinelli, Michael J Driscoll, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Neufeld, Christopher A. Wray. (Nakajima, Simon)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus, filed by Ksenia Nebunishvili, George Nebunishvili, Makvala Licheli. ENDORSEMENT: The Government is directed to respond to this Complaint by December 9, 2019. SO ORDERED. William Barr answer due 12/9/2019; Robert M. Cowan answer due 12/9/2019; Ken Cuccinelli answer due 12/9/2019; Michael J Driscoll answer due 12/9/2019; Kevin McAleenan answer due 12/9/2019; Christopher A. Wray answer due 12/9/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/25/2019) (jca)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr, Thomas Cioppa, Robert M. Cowan, Ken Cuccinelli, Michael J Driscoll, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Neufeld, Christopher A. Wray. (dnh)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Barr; Kevin Mcaleenan; Ken Cuccinelli; Christopher A. Wray; Michael J. Driscoll; Donald Neufeld; Robert M. Cowan; Thomas Cioppa, re: #4 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Makvala Licheli, George Nebunishvili, Ksenia Nebunishvili. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants' Addresses)(Grosz, Allison)
November 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
November 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
November 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Allison N Grosz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons must be linked to the corresponding accepted pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
November 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Allison N Grosz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Barr; Kevin McAleenan; Ken Cuccinelli; Christopher A. Wray; Michael J. Driscoll; Donald Neufeld; Robert M. Cowan; Thomas Cioppa. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (sj)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against William Barr, THOMAS CIOPPA, KEN CUCCINELLI, Robert M. Cowan, Michael J Driscoll, Kevin McAleenan, DONALD NEUFELD, Christopher A. Wray.Document filed by Ksenia Nebunishvili, George Nebunishvili, Makvala Licheli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Grosz, Allison)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Allison N Grosz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 11/25/2019. (sj)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grosz, Allison)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Barr; Kevin Mcaleenan; Ken Cuccinelli; Christopher A. Wray; Michael J. Driscoll; Donald Neufeld; Robert M. Cowan; Thomas Cioppa, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Makvala Licheli, George Nebunishvili, Ksenia Nebunishvili. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Defendants' Addresses)(Grosz, Allison) Modified on 11/19/2019 (sj).
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU COMPLAINT against William Barr, THOMAS CIOPPA, KEN CUCCINELLI, Robert M. Cowan, Michael J Driscoll, Kevin McAleenan, DONALD NEUFELD, Christopher A. Wray. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18075802)Document filed by Ksenia Nebunishvili, George Nebunishvili, Makvala Licheli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Grosz, Allison) Modified on 11/18/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Licheli et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director KEN CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Director DONALD NEUFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Robert M. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Agent Michael J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director THOMAS CIOPPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Driscoll
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Cowan
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cioppa
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ksenia Nebunishvili
Represented By: Allison N Grosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makvala Licheli
Represented By: Allison N Grosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Nebunishvili
Represented By: Allison N Grosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?