MVNY Holdings, LLC et al v. Double Black Ventures, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arie Maor, Dana Gordon, Gabriel Zelwin, The Israel Levy Revocable Trust, MVNY Holdings, LLC, Dafna Levy, Ester Maor, Albert Levy, The Noah H. Levy Revocable Trust, Israel Levy Revocable Trust and Noah N. Levy Revocable Trust
Defendant: Darryl Romanoff, Stuart Romanoff, PCG Mishawaka, LLC, Double Black Ventures, LLC, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Village Green Mishawaka Holdings, LLC, Leo Esses and Village Green Mishawaka Holdings
Case Number: 1:2019cv10640
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331ra
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. answer due 1/21/2020. (jwh)
December 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Double Black Ventures, LLC answer due 1/21/2020; Darryl Romanoff answer due 1/21/2020; Stuart Romanoff answer due 1/21/2020. (jwh)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: The Cross-Claimaints' deadline to respond to the cross-claims asserted in Defendant Village Green Mishawaka Holdings' Answer, see ECF No. 23, is extended to January 21, 2020. Further extensions are unlikely to be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 30. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/20/2019) (jwh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Joshua Horowitz on behalf of Darryl Romanoff, Stuart Romanoff. (Horowitz, Adam)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Steven L. Klepper, Esq. dated December 19, 2019. Document filed by Double Black Ventures, LLC, Darryl Romanoff, Stuart Romanoff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulation Extending Time to Respond)(Klepper, Steven)
December 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jayne A. Risk on behalf of Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.. (Risk, Jayne)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSION OF ELECTRONIC COURTESY COPIES. With respect to the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and any later substantive motions in this case, the parties shall adhere to the following procedure for the submission of electronic courtesy copies (which are to be filed in addition to, rather than in place of, paper courtesy copies). No later than two business days after the final filing of any substantive motion, the moving party or parties shall submit electronic courtesy copies of all motion papers in electronic folders titled with the docket number of the relevant motion in brackets followed by a description of the motion (e.g., " #14 Defendants Double Black Ventures & Romanoffs' Motion to Dismiss"). The folder shall contain as further set forth in this Order. The moving party or parties should submit the electronic courtesy copies to the Court by e-mail to Furman_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov or, if that is not feasible due to file-size restrictions, on one or more CD-ROMs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/11/19) (yv)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by January 14, 2020. Plaintiffs will not be given any further opportunity to amend the complaint to address issues raised by the motions to dismiss. If no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiff shall file a single, consolidated opposition to the motions to dismiss, supported by a memorandum of law not to exceed 40 pages, by January 14, 2020. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by January 21, 2020, and, absent leave of Court, shall be filed the form of a single, consolidated memorandum of law not to exceed 20 pages. At the time any reply is served, the moving party or parties shall supply the Court with one, double-sided courtesy hard copy of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Finally, it is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for December 16, 2019 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2020., Responses due by 1/14/2020, Replies due by 1/21/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/11/19) (yv)
December 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun on behalf of Dana Gordon, Israel Levy Revocable Trust, Albert Levy, Dafna Levy, MVNY Holdings, LLC, Arie Maor, Ester Maor, Noah N. Levy Revocable Trust, Gabriel Zelwin. (Kaploun, Eliyahu)
December 11, 2019 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Double Black Ventures, LLC.(Klepper, Steven)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by PCG Mishawaka, LLC.(Garbarini, Richard)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against Darryl Romanoff, PCG Mishawaka, LLC, Leo Esses, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Double Black Ventures, LLC, Stuart Romanoff., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Village Green Mishawaka Holdings.(Bryks, Bryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Village Green Mishawaka Holdings.(Bryks, Bryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.. (Kronley, Neal)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc..(Kronley, Neal)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Leo Esses. (Scher, Brett)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Brett A. Scher in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Leo Esses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F (Part I/II), #7 Exhibit F (Part II/II), #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Scher, Brett)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Leo Esses.(Scher, Brett)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Access to the Court's usual courtroom in the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse is severely curtailed due to elevator maintenance issues. Accordingly, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for December 17, 2019, at 3:00 p.m., will take place on December 16, 2019, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom 11B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. The parties are reminded that they must file on ECF no later than this Thursday, a joint letter, the contents of which are described in the Courts order scheduling the initial pretrial conference, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter. See ECF No. 4. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/10/2019) (jca)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion of Double Black Ventures, LLC Darryl Romanoff, and Stuart Romanoff to Dismiss Verified Complaint in Its Entirety. . Document filed by Double Black Ventures, LLC, Darryl Romanoff, Stuart Romanoff.(Klepper, Steven)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss /Motion of Double Black Ventures, LLC Darryl Romanoff, and Stuart Romanoff to Dismiss Verified Complaint in Its Entirety. Document filed by Double Black Ventures, LLC, Darryl Romanoff, Stuart Romanoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Klepper, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summons with Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 - Demand for Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 - Amended Summons with Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6 - Filing Cade Details, #8 Exhibit 7 - OSC of Motion to Intervene)(Klepper, Steven)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Nathan P. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Nathan P. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18195769. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Nathan P. Heller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18195769. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nathan P. Heller, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Heller, Nathan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. PCG Mishawaka, LLC served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service was accepted by Sou Kouky, Authorized Agent Office of New York Secretary of State. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Gabriel Zelwin; Noah N. Levy Revocable Trust ; MVNY Holdings, LLC; Dafna Levy; Israel Levy Revocable Trust ; Ester Maor; Arie Maor; Dana Gordon ; Albert Levy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Certified mailing receipts)(Kaploun, Eliyahu)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND, Application DENIED. The initial conference for this matter is scheduled for December 17, 2019. In light of that, and considering that there are many defendants in this action who have already submitted requests to extend their deadline to answer Plaintiffs' complaint, to consolidate the deadlines, each defendant shall submit its answer by no later than December 10, 2019. Other requests for alternative deadlines or extensions are unlikely to be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time /Stipulation Extending Time to Respond (related document(s) #1 ). filed by Darryl Romanoff, Double Black Ventures, LLC, Stuart Romanoff. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/22/19) (yv)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time /Stipulation Extending Time to Respond (related document(s) #1 ). Document filed by Double Black Ventures, LLC, Darryl Romanoff, Stuart Romanoff. Return Date set for 12/20/2019 at 05:00 PM.(Klepper, Steven)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER terminating as moot #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. See ECF No. 7. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 5. Leo Esses answer due 12/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/19/2019) (mro)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Neal Kronley dated November 19, 2019. Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc..(Kronley, Neal)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Move addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Brett A. Scher dated 11/19/19. Document filed by Leo Esses.(Scher, Brett)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/18/2019) (ks)
November 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Neal F. Kronley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Noah H. Levy Revocable Trust, The Israel Levy Revocable Trust, Village Green Mishawaka Holdings, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cushman & Wakefield PLC for Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.. Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc..(Kronley, Neal)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kronley, Neal)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653450/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18077835).Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Amended Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Other State Court Documents)(Kronley, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MVNY Holdings, LLC et al v. Double Black Ventures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arie Maor
Represented By: Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Gordon
Represented By: Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Zelwin
Represented By: Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Israel Levy Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MVNY Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dafna Levy
Represented By: Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ester Maor
Represented By: Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Levy
Represented By: Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Noah H. Levy Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Levy Revocable Trust
Represented By: Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah N. Levy Revocable Trust
Represented By: Eliyahu Zalman Kaploun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Romanoff
Represented By: Adam Joshua Horowitz
Represented By: Steven L. Klepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Romanoff
Represented By: Adam Joshua Horowitz
Represented By: Steven L. Klepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCG Mishawaka, LLC
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double Black Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Steven L. Klepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.
Represented By: Neal F. Kronley
Represented By: Nathan P. Heller
Represented By: Jayne A. Risk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Green Mishawaka Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Esses
Represented By: Brett A. Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Green Mishawaka Holdings
Represented By: Bryan C Bryks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?