Cordero Barreiro v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Nathaly Cordero Barreiro and Ana Cordero Barreiro
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv10676
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By February 26, 2020, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. It is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 22, 2020 is ADJOURNED to March 10, 2020, at 11:20 a.m. By March 3, 2020, the parties shall submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/13/2020) (cf)
January 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Of America answer due 2/26/2020., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 11:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (cf)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Adjournment of Initial Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Rachael L. Doud dated January 10, 2020. Document filed by United States Of America.(Doud, Rachael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachael Lightfoot Doud on behalf of United States Of America. (Doud, Rachael)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Of America served on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. Service was accepted by Osrick Gordon. Document filed by Ana Cordero Barreiro; Ana Cordero Barreiro. (Pagan, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Of America served on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Ana Cordero Barreiro; Ana Cordero Barreiro. (Pagan, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all pa1iies consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by January 15, 2020, email a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at http://nysd.uscomis.gov/file/forms/consent-to-proceed-before-usmagistrate-judge and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscomis.gov. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/19/2019) (kv)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/19/2019) (kv)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Ana Cordero Barreiro, Ana Cordero Barreiro. (Pagan, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pagan, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against United States Of America. Document filed by Ana Cordero Barreiro, Ana Cordero Barreiro.(Pagan, William)
November 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Pagan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to Bronx; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
November 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney William Pagan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
November 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Pagan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Ana Cordero Barreiro, Nathaly Cordero Barreiro. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney William Pagan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Nature of suit was not selected. (pc)
November 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pagan, William) Modified on 11/19/2019 (pc).
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Ana Cordero Barreiro. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18086717)Document filed by Ana Cordero Barreiro.(Pagan, William) Modified on 11/19/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordero Barreiro v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaly Cordero Barreiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Cordero Barreiro
Represented By: William Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Rachael Lightfoot Doud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?