Goldman v. Cox Radio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Defendant: Cox Radio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10691
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during the conference held on November 6, 2019, the above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate these cases under the lead case, Docket No. 19-CV-2954, and to close the remaining cases for administrative purposes. All future filings shall be on the 19-CV-2954 docket only. As discussed on the record, Defendants may file a single, consolidated answer to all of Plaintiff's complains. All deadlines otherwise in force in 19-CV-2954 shall likewise apply to the cases to be consolidated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02954-JMF, 1:19-cv-10691-JMF, 1:19-cv-10693-JMF, 1:19-cv-10699-UA(rro)
November 19, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-02954-JMF. (rro)
November 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
November 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 19, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02954-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
November 19, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
November 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 1:19-cv-02954. (sjo)
November 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Middle; Case Number: 8:19-cv-02674. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Stipulation to Transfer Venue (Doc. #10 ). The parties make this request pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), which provides that "[f]or the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, a district court may transfer any civil action... to any district or division to which all parties have consented." The parties represent that they consent to the transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, where sixteen similar cases are currently pending before the Honorable Jesse M. Furman. Accordingly, the Court grants the parties' request. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/14/2019. (SGM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION /MOTION to Transfer Venue (Joint) by Cox Radio, Inc. (Fugate, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel E. Fugate on behalf of Cox Radio, Inc. (Fugate, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/12/2019. (TWL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/12/2019. (TWL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Kenneth P. Norwick is not permitted to practice in the Middle District of Florida. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to show cause, in writing, why his appearance should not be stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(a). Counsel has until December 9, 2019, to comply with this Order. Failure to do so will result in counsel's appearance being stricken from the record without further notice from the Court. Further, upon review of the file, the Court finds that the named counsel has not registered for CM/ECF access. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to register for CM/ECF access by December 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/7/2019. (TWL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (WCD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Kenneth P. Norwick of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (WCD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Cox Radio, Inc. (WCD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-2674-T-33JSS. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]
October 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cox Radio, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16075354) filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Goldman Photograph, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Spector, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman v. Cox Radio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Represented By: Joshua Byrne Spector
Represented By: Kenneth P. Norwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Radio, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel E. Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?