Mizel et al v. Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Provident Trust Group F/B/O Steven Mizel Roth IRA, Steven Mizel and Provident Trust Group
Defendant: Unified Asset Management. LLC and Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv10712
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Michael Rosales, Jr on behalf of Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, Unified Asset Management. LLC, Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC. (Rosales, Daniel)
January 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas James McKenna on behalf of Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group. New Address: Gainey McKenna & Egleston, 501 Fifth Avenue, 19th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10017, 2129831300. (McKenna, Thomas)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR FILE A REQUEST FOR A PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO THE INDIVIDUAL RULES OF THIS COURT AND CONSENTING TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants that the deadline for all Defendants to either file an Answer to the Complaint or a Request for a Pre-Motion Conference pursuant to the Individual Rules of this Court (2.B.) is consolidated to January 27, 2020. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants that both parties consent to electronic service of all documents pursuant to Rule 5(b)(2)(E) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. So Ordered. Unified Asset Management. LLC answer due 1/27/2020; Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC answer due 1/27/2020. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/6/2020) (js)
December 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ernest Edward Badway on behalf of Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, Unified Asset Management. LLC, Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC. (Badway, Ernest)
December 30, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, Unified Asset Management. LLC, Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC. (Badway, Ernest)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, Unified Asset Management. LLC, Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC. (Badway, Ernest)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. Service was accepted by Maureen Cogan - Legal Representative of CSC. Document filed by Steven Mizel; Provident Trust Group. (McKenna, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Unified Asset Management. LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. Service was accepted by Maureen Cogan - Legal Representative of CSC. Document filed by Steven Mizel; Provident Trust Group. (McKenna, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP. (pne)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group. (McKenna, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC. (dnh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Unified Asset Management. LLC. (dnh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP. (dnh)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group. (McKenna, Thomas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Unified Asset Management, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group. (McKenna, Thomas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group. (McKenna, Thomas)
November 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
November 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas James McKenna. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
November 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas James McKenna. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group, Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne)
November 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas James McKenna re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Steven Mizel must be added to the case a second time. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
November 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas James McKenna to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption entered on summons request does not exaclty match pleading caption; if the entire caption does not fit in the space provided, name the first party on each side followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group F/B/O Steven Mizel Roth IRA. (McKenna, Thomas) Modified on 11/20/2019 (pne).
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Unified Asset Management, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group F/B/O Steven Mizel Roth IRA. (McKenna, Thomas) Modified on 11/20/2019 (pne).
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group F/B/O Steven Mizel Roth IRA. (McKenna, Thomas) Modified on 11/20/2019 (pne).
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McKenna, Thomas)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP, Unified Asset Management. LLC, Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18096907)Document filed by Steven Mizel, Provident Trust Group F/B/O Steven Mizel Roth IRA.(McKenna, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mizel et al v. Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Asset Management. LLC
Represented By: Daniel Michael Rosales, Jr
Represented By: Ernest Edward Badway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Capital Partners 3 LLC
Represented By: Daniel Michael Rosales, Jr
Represented By: Ernest Edward Badway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Consolidated Asset Funding 3 LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Trust Group F/B/O Steven Mizel Roth IRA
Represented By: Thomas James McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Mizel
Represented By: Thomas James McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Trust Group
Represented By: Thomas James McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?