Mosley v. Campbell
Plaintiff: Osiris Mosley
Defendant: Danny Campbell
Case Number: 1:2019cv10722
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Osiris Mosley, at 2194 University Avenue Bronx, NY 10453, on 12/20/2019 Re: #6 Order of Service via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (bwa)
December 20, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 12/20/2019 Re: Judge Edgardo Ramos #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Police Officer Danny Campbell. (bwa)
December 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Danny Campbell. (bwa)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court further directs the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for Defendant Campbell, complete a USM-285 form with the service address for Campbell, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service on Campbell to the U.S. Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/19/2019) (kv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
December 18, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application to Osiris Mosley 2194 University Avenue Bronx, NY 10453. (aea)
December 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 18, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/18/2019) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Osiris Mosley consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Osiris Mosley. (sac)
November 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Danny Campbell. Document filed by Osiris Mosley. (sac)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Osiris Mosley. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osiris Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?