Love et al v. West et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Love and LaJarvis Love
Defendant: Saint Francis of Assisi School, James Gannon, Franciscan Brothers of Brooklyn, Friars of Assumption BVM Province, Inc., Catholic Diocese of Jackson and Paul West
Case Number: 1:2019cv10799
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Saint Francis of Assisi School. (jgo)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul West. (jgo)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Gannon. (jgo)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Friars of Assumption BVM Province, Inc.. (jgo)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Franciscan Brothers of Brooklyn. (jgo)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Catholic Diocese of Jackson. (jgo)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Gannon, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Love, LaJarvis Love. (Pennock, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Friars of Assumption BVM Province, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Love, LaJarvis Love. (Pennock, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Franciscan Brothers of Brooklyn, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Love, LaJarvis Love. (Pennock, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Catholic Diocese of Jackson, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Love, LaJarvis Love. (Pennock, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Saint Francis of Assisi School, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Love, LaJarvis Love. (Pennock, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul West, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Love, LaJarvis Love. (Pennock, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pennock, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Catholic Diocese of Jackson, Franciscan Brothers of Brooklyn, Friars of Assumption BVM Province, Inc., James Gannon, Saint Francis of Assisi School, Paul West. Document filed by LaJarvis Love, Joshua Love.(Pennock, Paul)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul Joseph Pennock to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple Nature of Suit codes selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Paul Joseph Pennock to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Joseph Pennock. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Civil Miscellaneous Case - Other; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Paul Joseph Pennock to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'as to' docket entry text must list all of the parties whom summons is for and may not include 'et al'; each summons must be filed separately or one summons request may be filed with a 'rider' attached; party name on the PDF 'To' section must exactly match pleading caption and may not be abbreviated;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul West et al., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joshua Love, LaJarvis Love. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Pennock, Paul) Modified on 11/22/2019 (jgo).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pennock, Paul) Modified on 11/22/2019 (jgo).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18117315)Document filed by LaJarvis Love, Joshua Love.(Pennock, Paul) Modified on 11/22/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love et al v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis of Assisi School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Brothers of Brooklyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friars of Assumption BVM Province, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Diocese of Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Love
Represented By: Paul Joseph Pennock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaJarvis Love
Represented By: Paul Joseph Pennock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?