Alexander v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jeriel Alexander
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10811
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jeriel Alexander.(sbr)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 1/27/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/27/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/26/2019) (Attachments: #1 Supplement ifp)(bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #8 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application to Jeriel Alexander 79-81 Main Street #1253 Yonkers, NY 10701. (nb)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jeriel Alexander.(sbr)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #6 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Jeriel Alexander 79-81 Main Street #1253 Yonkers, NY 10701. (vba)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff must either pay the $400.00 in fees or submit a second amended IFP application within thirty days from the date of this order. An IFP application is attached for Plaintiff's convenience. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that appellant demonstrates good faith when seeking review of a nonfrivolous issue). Filing Fee due by 1/6/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/6/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/6/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jeriel Alexander.(sbr)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Jeriel Alexander 79-81 Main Street #1253 Yonkers, NY 10701. (vba)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 12/23/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/22/2019) (Attachments: #1 Supplement amended ifp)(bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Jeriel Alexander consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Jeriel Alexander. (sac)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Document filed by Jeriel Alexander. (sac)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jeriel Alexander. (sac)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeriel Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?