Stanbro v. Westchester County Health Care Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Chad Stanbro
Defendant: Westchester County Health Care Corporation, Westchester Medical Center, Dr. Frank Weber, Dr. John Full, John Full and Frank Weber
Case Number: 1:2019cv10857
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Glenn D Miller on behalf of Chad Stanbro. (Miller, Glenn)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED as follows: Initial Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/13/2020) (mml)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Full, Frank Weber, Westchester County Health Care Corporation, Westchester Medical Center. (dnh)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Westchester County Health Care Corporation, Westchester Medical Center, Frank Weber and John Full, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chad Stanbro. (Sivin, Edward)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sivin, Edward)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Weiss on behalf of Chad Stanbro. (Weiss, Andrew)
November 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
November 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Edward Sivin to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The second page of the Civil Cover Sheet was omitted.Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sivin, Edward) Modified on 11/25/2019 (dnh).
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Full, Frank Weber, Westchester County Health Care Corporation, Westchester Medical Center. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18133119)Document filed by Chad Stanbro.(Sivin, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanbro v. Westchester County Health Care Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester County Health Care Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Frank Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Full
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Full
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Stanbro
Represented By: Edward Sivin
Represented By: Andrew Weiss
Represented By: Glenn D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?