Almazon v. Safeguard Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Doina Almazon
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10893
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Accordingly, each party may submit a letter on or before February 5, 2020, describing why that party believes this case should remain before the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Absent good cause shown, after that date this Court will issue an order transferring this case to the Eastern District. The initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for January 29, 2020 is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/23/2020) (rro)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Attorney Diane B Carvell dated January 7, 2020 re: advising that plaintiff filed for Chapter 13 bankruptcy in the USDC EDNY on 12/17/19. Document filed by Safeguard Properties, LLC.(Carvell, Diane)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/18/2019) (rro)
November 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sj)
November 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Diane Beckman Carvell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
November 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Diane Beckman Carvell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Doina Almazon; Safeguard Properties, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Safeguard Properties Management, LLC.(Carvell, Diane)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Carvell, Diane)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of NY, County of New York. Case Number: 101671/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18143112).Document filed by Safeguard Properties Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carvell, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almazon v. Safeguard Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doina Almazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, LLC
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?