ECars Factory LLC v. Braunstein et al
Plaintiff: ECars Factory LLC
Defendant: Howard N. Braunstein, M & M Automotive Center Inc., M & M Auto Group, Inc., M & M Ford Lincoln Mercury, Inc., MBM Enterprises LLC and Martin Braunstein
Case Number: 1:2019cv11027
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 USBC CASE NUMBER 19-9040 (CGM). (gp)
December 12, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York. (gp)
December 2, 2019 Transmission to the Civil Case Openings Clerk. Transmitted re: #9 Order Referring Case to Bankruptcy Court,, to the Civil Case Openings Clerk for case processing. (sjo)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DUPLICATE ORIGINAL AMENDED STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(a) any or all cases under title 11 and any or all proceedings arising under title 11 or arising in or related to a case under title 11 are referred to the bankruptcy judges for this district. (See 1:12-mc-00032 (M-10-468) Order Filed February 1, 2012) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (sjo)
December 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
December 2, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
December 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:19-cv-05767. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
November 26, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of New York. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached, the Court partially grants Defendant-Debtors' motion and transfers this action to the Southern District of New York to be referred to its Bankruptcy Court. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/26/2019. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re Scheduling Order, Memorandum of Law in Support of Removal of State Court Action and Transfer to Southern District of New York and in Opposition to Letter Request to Remand Action to State Court filed by M & M Auto Group, Inc., M & M Automotive Center Inc., M & M Ford Lincoln Mercury, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Howard Braunstein) (Cvek, Julie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Refer/Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by ECars Factory LLC. (Wolf, Martin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court directs Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' motion to refer/remand to Bankruptcy Court by 11/4/2019 and Defendants to reply to Plaintiff's response by 11/11/2019. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/21/2019. (Shi, Yi Qing) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by M & M Auto Group, Inc., M & M Automotive Center Inc., M & M Ford Lincoln Mercury, Inc. (Cvek, Julie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Refer/Remand to Bankruptcy Court by M & M Auto Group, Inc., M & M Automotive Center Inc., M & M Ford Lincoln Mercury, Inc.. (Cvek, Julie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by M & M Auto Group, Inc., M & M Automotive Center Inc., M & M Ford Lincoln Mercury, Inc. (Cvek, Julie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by M & M Auto Group, Inc., M & M Automotive Center Inc., M & M Ford Lincoln Mercury, Inc. from New York State Supreme Court, Kings County, case number Index No. 521016/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11938406) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit D to Complaint, #6 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit E to Complaint, #7 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit F to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit G to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit H to Complaint, #10 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit I to Complaint, #11 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit J to Complaint, #12 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit K to Complaint) (Cvek, Julie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ECars Factory LLC v. Braunstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard N. Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & M Automotive Center Inc.
Represented By: Julie A Cvek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & M Auto Group, Inc.
Represented By: Julie A Cvek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & M Ford Lincoln Mercury, Inc.
Represented By: Julie A Cvek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBM Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECars Factory LLC
Represented By: Martin Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?