Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A. v. Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund A, LP et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.
Defendant: ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST) II, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND A, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST), LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND B, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine II, LP and Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv11058
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. . Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.. (Gray, Christopher)
January 16, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Remand Action to New York State Court. . Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.. (Gray, Christopher)
January 9, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Stefan Atkinson in Opposition re: #19 MOTION to Remand Action to New York State Court.. Document filed by Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine II, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund A, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund B, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amendment to 2nd A&R Credit Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - S.D.N.Y. 18-cv-02907 Dkt. 33-20, #3 Exhibit C - S.D.N.Y. 18-cv-02907 Dkt. 33-21, #4 Exhibit D - Furie - Final DIP Order, #5 Exhibit E - Bidding Procedures Order. Bkr. Dkt. 185, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Default, #7 Exhibit G - Second Amended and Restated Credit Agreement Executed, #8 Exhibit H - 1. ECP Kososki Dec. 1.9.20)(Atkinson, Stefan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #19 MOTION to Remand Action to New York State Court. . Document filed by Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine II, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund A, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund B, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine, LP. (Atkinson, Stefan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. . Document filed by Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine II, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund A, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund B, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine, LP. (Atkinson, Stefan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of C. Neil Gray in Support re: #19 MOTION to Remand Action to New York State Court.. Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pledge Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Draft Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Bankruptcy Plan, #4 Exhibit D - Opposition to Standing Motion)(Gray, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Remand Action to New York State Court. . Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.. (Gray, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand Action to New York State Court. Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A..(Gray, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of C. Neil Gray in Opposition re: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware.. Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Pledge Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Bankruptcy Plan, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Opposition to Standing Motion)(Gray, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. . Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.. (Gray, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Stefan Atkinson, P.C. dated 12/13/19 re: Response to the December 9, 2019 letter. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby adopts Defendant ECP's proposed briefing schedule. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to ECP's motion to transfer, motion to remand, and complaint by January 2, 2020; ECP shall file its reply in support of its motion to transfer and opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand by January 9, 2020; and Plaintiff shall, if it so chooses, file its sur-reply in opposition to ECP's motion to transfer and reply in support of its motion to remand by January 16, 2020. ( Responses due by 1/2/2020, Replies due by 1/9/2020., Surreplies due by 1/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/18/2019) (mro)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE re: #13 Response, #9 Letter, . Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.. (Gray, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Anna G. Rotman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re: #9 Letter, . Document filed by Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine II, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund A, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund B, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine, LP. (Atkinson, Stefan)
December 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Anna G. Rotman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Anna G. Rotman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine II, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund A, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund B, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rotman, Anna)
December 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 MOTION for Anna G. Rotman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18273808. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Anna G. Rotman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18273808. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine II, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund A, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund B, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rotman, Anna) Modified on 12/13/2019 (wb).
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter re: Request to set a Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's anticipated motion for remand and Defendants' pending motion to transfer venue, filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants shall file a letter by December 13, 2019 explaining how, if at all, they will be prejudiced if the Court adopts Plaintiff's proposed briefing scheduled. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/10/2019) (rj)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Christopher Neil Gray dated December 9, 2019 re: Request to set a Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's anticipated motion for remand and Defendants' pending motion to transfer venue.. Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A..(Gray, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A..(Gray, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Neil Gray on behalf of Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.. (Gray, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine II, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund A, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund B, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund, LP, Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine, LP.(Atkinson, Stefan)
December 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stefan H. Atkinson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1442nr; Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1334; the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stefan H. Atkinson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST) II, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND B, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND A, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST), LP. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (dnh)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Stefan Atkinson in Support re: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware.. Document filed by ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST) II, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST), LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND A, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND B, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Webb Motion, #3 Exhibit C - RWIO Motion, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Trent J. Kososki in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, #5 Exhibit E - Brutus Declaration)(Atkinson, Stefan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. . Document filed by ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST) II, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST), LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND A, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND B, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP. (Atkinson, Stefan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Document filed by ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST) II, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST), LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND A, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND B, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP.(Atkinson, Stefan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Atkinson, Stefan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 656717/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18188159).Document filed by ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST) II, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND B, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND A, LP, ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST), LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons with Notice)(Atkinson, Stefan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A. v. Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunities Fund A, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST) II, LP
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Represented By: Anna G. Rotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND A, LP
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Represented By: Anna G. Rotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE (ALASKA MIDSTREAM COINVEST), LP
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENERGY CAPITAL PARTNERS MEZZANINE OPPORTUNITIES FUND B, LP
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Represented By: Anna G. Rotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine II, LP
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Represented By: Anna G. Rotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine, LP
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Represented By: Anna G. Rotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Oel & Gas S.A.
Represented By: Christopher Neil Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?