Almonte v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Alquidania Almonte
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv11063
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Declaration in Opposition to Pltf's Motion and Memo of Law served on Krieger, Wilansky & Hupart, Esqs. on January 30, 2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Target Corporation. (Hannon, Ian)
January 29, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #18 SECOND MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court, New York County., #12 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court New York County. . Document filed by Target Corporation. (Hannon, Ian)
January 29, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Ian E. Hannon in Opposition re: #18 SECOND MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court, New York County., #12 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court New York County.. Document filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S&C, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Dmnd, #4 Exhibit Pltf's Response to dmnd, #5 Exhibit NOR, #6 Exhibit Pltf's Motion, #7 Exhibit Court's Order, #8 Exhibit NOR, #9 Exhibit NYSEF Docket, #10 Exhibit printout, #11 Affidavit)(Hannon, Ian)
January 29, 2020 Filing 20 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 SECOND MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court, New York County. . Document filed by Alquidania Almonte. (Hupart, Brett)
January 29, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Brett R. Hupart in Support re: #18 SECOND MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court, New York County.. Document filed by Alquidania Almonte. (Hupart, Brett)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 SECOND MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court, New York County. Document filed by Alquidania Almonte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on Defendant, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Verified Bill of Particulars, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Envelope, #7 Exhibit Notice of Removal filed with New York County Clerk's Office, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Hupart, Brett)
January 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Brett Roger Hupart to RE-FILE Document #17 SECOND MOTION to Remand to New York County Supreme Court. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Affirmation in Support of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion are both found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SECOND MOTION to Remand to New York County Supreme Court. Document filed by Alquidania Almonte. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation in Support of Motion, #2 Supplement Memo of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Answer, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Bill of Particulars and Response to Combined Demands, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Envelope, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - State Court Notice of Removal Filing, #10 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Hupart, Brett) Modified on 1/28/2020 (ldi).
January 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 1/8/2020. (Daniels, Anthony)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. As discussed during the telephone conference held on January 8, 2020, Plaintiff's motion to remand is due January 15, 2020; Defendant's opposition is due no later than two weeks following service of Plaintiff's motion; and Plaintiff's reply is due no later than one week following service of Defendant's opposition. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on January 8, 2020)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: granting #14 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding Plaintiff's proposed motion to remand on January 8, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/07/2020) (ama)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Brett R. Hupart dated 1/6/20. Document filed by Alquidania Almonte.(Hupart, Brett)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases require that a party request a pre-motion conference prior to filing a motion to remand a case to state court. See Rule 2(C). Plaintiff failed to comply with that rule. As a result, the motion is denied without prejudice. As directed in the Court's December 7, 2019 order, counsel are again directed to review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court New York County. Document filed by Alquidania Almonte. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Affirmation in Support of Motion and Blueback, #2 Supplement Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Answer, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Verified Bill of Particulars and Response to Combined Demands, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Envelope containing Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - NY State Courts E-File Printout, #10 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Hupart, Brett) Modified on 1/28/2020 (ldi).
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Alquidania Almonte (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Hupart, Brett)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Roger Hupart on behalf of Alquidania Almonte. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Hupart, Brett)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sal F. DeLuca on behalf of Target Corporation. (DeLuca, Sal)
December 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County on December 3, 2019. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than January 3, 2020. Additionally, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/7/2019) (mro)
December 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/7/2019) (mro)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on Krieger, Wilansky & Hupart, Esqs. on December 4, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Target Corporation. (Hannon, Ian)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Krieger, Wilansky & Hupart, Esqs. on December 4, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Target Corporation. (Hannon, Ian)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 153108/2019..Document filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S&C, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Response to CD)(Hannon, Ian)
December 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
December 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ian Edward Hannon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
December 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ian Edward Hannon to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Target Corporation.(Hannon, Ian)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hannon, Ian)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBIT ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 153108/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18191370).Document filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hannon, Ian) Modified on 12/4/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almonte v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alquidania Almonte
Represented By: Brett Roger Hupart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Ian Edward Hannon
Represented By: Sal F. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?