Francois v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: Eugenie Francois
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv11119
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's time to respond to the complaint is extended to February 24, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Monaliza Seepersaud dated December 18, 2019. Document filed by New York City Department of Education.(Seepersaud, Monaliza)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. New York City Department of Education served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Clerk, New York City Law Dept. Document filed by Eugenie Francois. (sc)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Eugenie Francois P.O. Box 340925 Brooklyn, NY 11234, at, on 12/9/2019 Re: #4 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, a copy of the Mediation Referral Order for Pro Se Employment Discrimination Cases, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 1 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (nb)
December 9, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education. (nb)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES...IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/9/2019) (kv)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons as to Defendant New York City Department of Education. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summons. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendant or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendant under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons, and to mail the summons and a copy of this order to Plaintiff, noting service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/9/2019) (kv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
December 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)
December 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 465401249716) Document filed by Eugenie Francois. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francois v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenie Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Monaliza Seepersaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?