Sarikaputar et al v. Veratip Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Chaichana Kittironnakornkul, Phouviengsone Sysouvong, PEDRO COJ CUMES, Kay Kittironnakornkul, Paranee Sarikaputar, Tukta Phouviengsone, Supunnee Sukasawett, Supatra Wungmarn, Wipaporn Sittidej, Phaisit Sirimatrasit and Vinai Patan
Defendant: Chardenpong Oonapanyo, Perapong Chotimanenophan, Adidsuda Chunton, Michael P Bronstein, Lucky DD Corp, Chareonpong Oonapanyo, Excel Restaurant Group Corp., Michael Bronstein, Ah Di, NINETY-NINE PLUS CORP., Excellent Dumpling House Inc, Gift Rakowski, Veratip Corp., Hin Wai Law, LUCKY CHARM 6365 CORP, 9999 MIDTOWN CORP., J Akira LLC, Thainy Restaurant LLC, Opulent Restaurant Corporation, Thai-to-Go LLC, Peter Chotimanenophan, Prosperity 89 Corp., Amy Chunton and Lucky Charm 6365 Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11168
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-00814-ALC-SDA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Lucky DD Corp served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Supatra Wungmarn; Vinai Patan; Pedro Coj Cumes; Paranee Sarikaputar; Wipaporn Sittidej; Phouviengsone Sysouvong; Chaichana Kittironnakornkul; Phaisit Sirimatrasit; Supunnee Sukasawett. (Troy, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Opulent Restaurant Corporation served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Supatra Wungmarn; Vinai Patan; Pedro Coj Cumes; Paranee Sarikaputar; Wipaporn Sittidej; Phouviengsone Sysouvong; Chaichana Kittironnakornkul; Phaisit Sirimatrasit; Supunnee Sukasawett. (Troy, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Thai-to-Go LLC served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Supatra Wungmarn; Vinai Patan; Pedro Coj Cumes; Paranee Sarikaputar; Wipaporn Sittidej; Phouviengsone Sysouvong; Chaichana Kittironnakornkul; Phaisit Sirimatrasit; Supunnee Sukasawett. (Troy, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. 9999 Midtown Corp. served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Supatra Wungmarn; Vinai Patan; Pedro Coj Cumes; Paranee Sarikaputar; Wipaporn Sittidej; Phouviengsone Sysouvong; Chaichana Kittironnakornkul; Phaisit Sirimatrasit; Supunnee Sukasawett. (Troy, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ninety-Nine Plus Corp. served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Supatra Wungmarn; Vinai Patan; Pedro Coj Cumes; Paranee Sarikaputar; Wipaporn Sittidej; Phouviengsone Sysouvong; Chaichana Kittironnakornkul; Phaisit Sirimatrasit; Supunnee Sukasawett. (Troy, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Excellent Dumpling House Inc served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Supatra Wungmarn; Vinai Patan; Pedro Coj Cumes; Paranee Sarikaputar; Wipaporn Sittidej; Phouviengsone Sysouvong; Chaichana Kittironnakornkul; Phaisit Sirimatrasit; Supunnee Sukasawett. (Troy, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Thainy Restaurant LLC served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Supatra Wungmarn; Vinai Patan; Pedro Coj Cumes; Paranee Sarikaputar; Wipaporn Sittidej; Phouviengsone Sysouvong; Chaichana Kittironnakornkul; Phaisit Sirimatrasit; Supunnee Sukasawett. (Troy, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Veratip Corp. served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Supatra Wungmarn; Vinai Patan; Pedro Coj Cumes; Paranee Sarikaputar; Wipaporn Sittidej; Phouviengsone Sysouvong; Chaichana Kittironnakornkul; Phaisit Sirimatrasit; Supunnee Sukasawett. (Troy, John)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gift Rakowski waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Gift Rakowski. (Li, Bingchen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Prosperity 89 Corp. waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Prosperity 89 Corp.. (Li, Bingchen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lucky Charm 6365 Corp. waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Lucky Charm 6365 Corp.. (Li, Bingchen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. J Akira LLC waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by J Akira LLC. (Li, Bingchen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Excel Restaurant Group Corp. waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Excel Restaurant Group Corp.. (Li, Bingchen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael P Bronstein waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Michael P Bronstein. (Li, Bingchen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Adidsuda Chunton waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Adidsuda Chunton. (Li, Bingchen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bingchen Li on behalf of Michael P Bronstein, Adidsuda Chunton, Excel Restaurant Group Corp., J Akira LLC, Lucky Charm 6365 Corp., Prosperity 89 Corp., Gift Rakowski. (Li, Bingchen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bingchen Li on behalf of Michael P Bronstein, Adidsuda Chunton, Excel Restaurant Group Corp., J Akira LLC, Lucky Charm 6365 Corp., Prosperity 89 Corp., Gift Rakowski. (Li, Bingchen)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 9999 Midtown Corp., Michael P Bronstein, Perapong Chotimanenophan, Adidsuda Chunton, Ah Di, Excel Restaurant Group Corp., Excellent Dumpling House Inc, J Akira LLC, Hin Wai Law, Lucky Charm 6365 Corp., Lucky DD Corp, Ninety-Nine Plus Corp., Chardenpong Oonapanyo, Opulent Restaurant Corporation, Prosperity 89 Corp., Gift Rakowski, Thai-to-Go LLC, Thainy Restaurant LLC, Veratip Corp.. (sj)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ninety-Nine Plus Corp; 9999 Midtown Corp; Lucky Charm 6365 Corp; Pedro Coj Cumes. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. as possibly related to 1:17cv0814. (sj)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIDAVIT of John Troy re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-00814. Document filed by PEDRO COJ CUMES, Chaichana Kittironnakornkul, Vinai Patan, Paranee Sarikaputar, Phaisit Sirimatrasit, Wipaporn Sittidej, Supunnee Sukasawett, Phouviengsone Sysouvong, Supatra Wungmarn.(Troy, John)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VERATIP CORP. d/b/a ThaiNY Restaurant,NINETY-NINE PLUS CORP.d/b/a ThaiNY Restaurant,J AKIRA LLC d/b/a Tom Yum d/b/a M-Thai, EXCEL RESTAURANT GROUP CORP. d/b/a Charms,THAINY RESTAURANT LLC d/b/a M Thai, 9999 MIDTOWN CORP. d/b/a Thai Rice and Noodle,EXCELLENT DUMPLING HOUSE INC. d/b/a Excellent Dumpling House, PROSPERITY 89 CORP. d/b/a Thais New York, THAI-TO-GO LLC d/b/a Thais New York,LUCKY CHARM 6365 CORP d/b/a Thais New York, OPULENT RESTAURANT CORPORATION d/b/a Thais New York,LUCKY DD CORP d/b/a Thais New York, PERAPONG CHOTIMANENOPHAN a/k/a Peter Chotimanenophan, MICHAEL P. BRONSTEIN a/k/a Michael Bronstein, CHARDENPONG OONAPANYO a/k/a Chareonpong Oonpanyo, ADIDSUDA CHUNTON a/k/a Amy Chunton, HIN WAI LAW, AH DI, and GIFT RAKOWSKI, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by PEDRO COJ CUMES, Chaichana Kittironnakornkul, Vinai Patan, Paranee Sarikaputar, Phaisit Sirimatrasit, Wipaporn Sittidej, Supunnee Sukasawett, Phouviengsone Sysouvong, Supatra Wungmarn. (Troy, John)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 9999 MIDTOWN CORP., Michael P Bronstein, Perapong Chotimanenophan, Adidsuda Chunton, Ah Di, Excel Restaurant Group Corp., Excellent Dumpling House Inc, J Akira LLC, LUCKY CHARM 6365 CORP, Hin Wai Law, Lucky DD Corp, NINETY-NINE PLUS CORP., Chardenpong Oonapanyo, Opulent Restaurant Corporation, Thai-to-Go LLC, Thainy Restaurant LLC, Veratip Corp., Prosperity 89 Corp., Gift Rakowski. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18223501)Document filed by Supatra Wungmarn, Vinai Patan, PEDRO COJ CUMES, Paranee Sarikaputar, Wipaporn Sittidej, Phouviengsone Sysouvong, Chaichana Kittironnakornkul, Phaisit Sirimatrasit, Supunnee Sukasawett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit Consent to Sue Form, #4 Exhibit Document Preservation Demand, #5 Exhibit Notice of Lien and Assignment, #6 Exhibit Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #7 Exhibit Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarikaputar et al v. Veratip Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chardenpong Oonapanyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perapong Chotimanenophan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adidsuda Chunton
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Bronstein
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky DD Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chareonpong Oonapanyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Restaurant Group Corp.
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bronstein
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ah Di
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NINETY-NINE PLUS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excellent Dumpling House Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gift Rakowski
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veratip Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hin Wai Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCKY CHARM 6365 CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9999 MIDTOWN CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Akira LLC
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thainy Restaurant LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opulent Restaurant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thai-to-Go LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Chotimanenophan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosperity 89 Corp.
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Chunton
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Charm 6365 Corp.
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaichana Kittironnakornkul
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phouviengsone Sysouvong
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO COJ CUMES
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Kittironnakornkul
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paranee Sarikaputar
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tukta Phouviengsone
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supunnee Sukasawett
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supatra Wungmarn
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wipaporn Sittidej
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phaisit Sirimatrasit
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinai Patan
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?