Binakis v. Sakayama et al
Plaintiff: Paraskevas Binakis and Patrick Binakis
Defendant: TNG Earthling Inc., Robert Sakayama, Bob Sakayama, Greenberg, Lynne Sakayama and Omega Legal Marketing
Case Number: 1:2019cv11216
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. TNG Earthling Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Mercer, Justin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lynne Sakayama served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Mercer, Justin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Robert Sakayama served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Mercer, Justin)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TNG Earthling Inc.. (jgo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Sakayama. (jgo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lynne Sakayama. (jgo)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TNG Earthling Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Lin, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lynne Sakayama, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Lin, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Sakayama, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Lin, David)
December 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Dong Ann Lin to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Each summons request must be filed as a sperate event or one summons request may be used by attaching a rider. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Sakayama, Lynne Sakayama, TNG Earthling Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lin, David) Modified on 12/17/2019 (dnh).
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Lin, David)
December 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney David Dong Ann Lin to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
December 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lin, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lynne Sakayama, Robert Sakayama, TNG Earthling Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18237103)Document filed by Paraskevas Binakis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Binakis v. Sakayama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNG Earthling Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sakayama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Sakayama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Sakayama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Legal Marketing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paraskevas Binakis
Represented By: David Dong Ann Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Binakis
Represented By: David Dong Ann Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?