Liriano et al v. New York City Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Jacinth Scott, Mercedes Liriano, Jasmine Dickson and Diane Roberts
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"), Patricia Catania and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv11245
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ria Julien, Esq. dated 2/6/20. Document filed by Jasmine Dickson, Mercedes Liriano, Diane Roberts, Jacinth Scott..(Julien, Ria)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of CORRESPONDENCE, SCHEDULING ORDER ISSUED JANUARY 10, 2020, AND JUDGE LORNA G. SCHOFIELD'S INDIVIDUAL RULES served on PLAINTIFFS on February 4, 2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Turpin, Christopher)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ria Julien to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): File State Court Records and Proceedings Purs. to Rule 81 along with the Complaint before requesting an Issuance of Summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patricia Catania, re: Complaint. Document filed by Jasmine Dickson, Mercedes Liriano, Diane Roberts, Jacinth Scott. (Mirer, Jeanne) Modified on 1/24/2020 (dnh).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/10/2020) (cf)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ria Julien on behalf of Jasmine Dickson, Mercedes Liriano, Diane Roberts, Jacinth Scott. (Julien, Ria)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by B. MAZYCK, AUTHORIZED AGENT. Document filed by Jasmine Dickson, Mercedes Liriano. (Julien, Ria)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher James Turpin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1441; County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1981; the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher James Turpin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mercedes Liriano; Jacinth Scott; Diane Roberts; Jasmine Dickson; New York City Department of Education; Patricia Catania. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on Plaintiffs on December 9, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"). (Turpin, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Turpin, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 33247/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18243750).Document filed by New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons with Notice))(Turpin, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liriano et al v. New York City Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE")
Represented By: Christopher James Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Catania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Christopher James Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinth Scott
Represented By: Ria Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Liriano
Represented By: Ria Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Dickson
Represented By: Ria Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Roberts
Represented By: Ria Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?