Lurch, Jr. v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Robert Derek Lurch, Jr.
Defendant: Hotel Staff Member(s) that called law enforcement or 911 on plaintiff on both incidents, The City of New York, Two Officers from the Nov. 30 incident, Kimpton Muse Hotel and Two Officers from the Oct. 13 2019 incident
Case Number: 1:2019cv11253
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 PRO SE MEMORANDUM(Letter) dated 1/2/20 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Derek Lurch, Jr. New Address: BKC#9801900520, West Facility, 16-00 Hazen Street, Sprung 11B, Cell#1108, East Elmhurst, New York, 11370. (sc)
January 13, 2020 Mailed a copy of #8 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Robert Derek Lurch, Jr. 9801900620 VCBC One Halleck Street Bronx, NY 10474. (aea)
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of mailing. The court mailed a copy of docket number 6 to Robert Derek Lurch, Jr., 9801900620, at VCBC, One Halleck Street, Bronx, NY 10474. (qs)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. The Plaintiff is directed to serve this order, and a copy of the complaint on the Defendants. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this order to the Pro-se litigant at the following address: Robert Dereck Lurch, Jr. at P.O. Box 540807, Bronx, NY 10454. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/13/2020) (ks) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 13, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order of Service, #2 Complaint, to the Kimpton Muse Hotel at 130 West 46th Street, New York, New York 10036. (bwa)
January 13, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order of Service, #2 Complaint, to the Corporation Counsel of the City of New York at 100 Church Street, New York, New York 10007. (bwa)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Robert Derek Lurch, Jr. 9801900620, at VCBC One Halleck Street, Bronx, NY 10474, on 1/13/2020 Re: #5 Order of Service via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (bwa)
January 13, 2020 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 1/13/2020 Re: Judge Alison J. Nathan #5 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)City of New York, Kimpton Muse Hotel. (bwa)
January 13, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kimpton Muse Hotel, The City of New York. (bwa)
January 13, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order of Service, a copy of the Docket Sheet to Robert Derek Lurch, Jr. ID No. 9801900620 VCBC One Halleck Street Bronx, NY 10474. (aea)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/09/2020) (ama)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to complete USM-285 forms with the service addresses for the City of New York and the Kimpton Muse Hotel, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service on those defendants to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court further directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to (1) the Corporation Counsel of the City of New York at 100 Church Street, New York, New York 10007, and (2) the Kimpton Muse Hotel at 130 West 46th Street, New York, New York 10036. An amended complaint form is attached to this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/9/2020) (kv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
January 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 9, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 9, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Robert Derek Lurch, Jr. P.O. Box 540807 Bronx, NY 10454. (aea)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/8/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Hotel Staff Member(s) that called law enforcement or 911 on plaintiff on both incidents, Kimpton Muse Hotel, The City of New York, Two Officers from the Nov. 30 incident, Two Officers from the Oct. 13 2019 incident. Document filed by Robert Derek Lurch, Jr..(rdz)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert Derek Lurch, Jr..(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lurch, Jr. v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Staff Member(s) that called law enforcement or 911 on plaintiff on both incidents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Officers from the Nov. 30 incident
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimpton Muse Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Officers from the Oct. 13 2019 incident
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Derek Lurch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?