Persaud et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Ms. LILOWTIE PERSAUD, TULSIRAM PERSAUD and Lilowtie Persaud
Defendant: Michael Pompeo, Acting Secretary KEVIN K MCALEENAN, William P. Barr, Acting USCIS Distric Lee F. Bowes, KEN CUCCINELLI, Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, Attorney General William Barr, Secretary Michael Pompeo, Acting Director Lee Bowes and Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv11275
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Nakajima on behalf of William Barr, Lee Bowes, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Michael Pompeo. (Nakajima, Simon)
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. William Barr served on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Ken Cuccinelli served on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Kevin McAleenan served on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Michael Pompeo served on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Lilowtie Persaud; Tulsiram Persaud. (Gehi, Naresh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr. (dnh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Pompeo. (dnh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin McAleenan. (dnh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ken Cuccinelli. (dnh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WILLIAM BARR, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Lilowtie Persaud, Tulsiram Persaud. (Gehi, Naresh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MICHAEL POMPEO, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Lilowtie Persaud, Tulsiram Persaud. (Gehi, Naresh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KEVIN McALEENAN, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Lilowtie Persaud, Tulsiram Persaud. (Gehi, Naresh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KEN CUCCINELLI, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Lilowtie Persaud, Tulsiram Persaud. (Gehi, Naresh)
December 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Naresh M. Gehi to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple summons requests can not be filed in a single PDF; each summons request must be filed separately or file one summons request with a rider/addendum listing all of the defendant's names and addresses. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, KEVIN McALEENAN, KEN CUCCINELLI, LEE BOWES., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Lilowtie Persaud, Tulsiram Persaud. (Gehi, Naresh) Modified on 12/18/2019 (pne).
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gehi, Naresh)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against William Barr, Lee Bowes, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Michael Pompeo. Document filed by Lilowtie Persaud, Tulsiram Persaud.(Gehi, Naresh)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/10/2019) (jwh)
December 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Naresh M. Gehi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 08:1154; County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 08:1182; the County code has been modified to Queens. (pne)
December 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Naresh M. Gehi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Barr, Lee Bowes, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Lilowtie Persaud, Tulsiram Persaud, Michael Pompeo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (pne)
December 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Naresh M. Gehi to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): incorrect basis of jurisdiction selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
December 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Naresh M. Gehi to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
December 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against LILOWTIE PERSAUD, TULSIRAM PERSAUD. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-18248576)Document filed by LILOWTIE PERSAUD, TULSIRAM PERSAUD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Exhibit -3, #4 Exhibit -4, #5 Exhibit -5, #6 Exhibit -6, #7 Exhibit -7, #8 Exhibit -8, #9 Exhibit -9)(Gehi, Naresh) Modified on 12/10/2019 (pne).
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gehi, Naresh) Modified on 12/10/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Persaud et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting USCIS Distric Lee F. Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Michael Pompeo
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Lee Bowes
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. LILOWTIE PERSAUD
Represented By: Naresh M. Gehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TULSIRAM PERSAUD
Represented By: Naresh M. Gehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilowtie Persaud
Represented By: Naresh M. Gehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?