McHenry v. Fox News Networks, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brittany McHenry
Defendant: Monica Mekeel, Fox News Networks, LLC, George Murdoch, John Finley, News Corporation, Jennifer Rauchet, FOX Corporation, Fox Entertainment Group and Tyrus
Case Number: 1:2019cv11294
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 30 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FOX Corporation, Corporate Parent Fox Television Stations, LLC, Corporate Parent Fox Television Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Foxcorp Holdings LLC for Fox News Networks, LLC. Document filed by Fox News Networks, LLC.(Lampe, Matthew)
January 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Matthew Willis Lampe to RE-FILE Document #19 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: IT IS SO ORDERED (George Murdoch answer due 3/9/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/15/2020) (jwh)
January 14, 2020 Filing 28 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #6 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Ariel V. Lieberman dated January 14, 2020. Document filed by George Murdoch.(Lieberman, Ariel)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: IT IS SO ORDERED. (FOX Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, Jennifer Rauchet, John Finley, and Monica Mekeel answer due 3/9/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/14/2020) (jwh)
January 13, 2020 Filing 26 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #6 Complaint to and including March 9, 2020 addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew W. Lampe dated January 13, 2020. Document filed by FOX Corporation.(Lampe, Matthew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. John Finley waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Fox News Networks, LLC waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Monica Mekeel waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Jennifer Rauchet waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Brittany McHenry. (Fudali, Arick)
January 13, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. George Murdoch waiver sent on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. Document filed by Brittany McHenry. (Fudali, Arick)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #17 Motion for Thomas A. Clare to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/10/2020) (jwh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maryssa Alexa Mataras on behalf of FOX Corporation, John Finley, Fox News Networks, LLC, Monica Mekeel, Jennifer Rauchet. (Mataras, Maryssa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristina Ann Yost on behalf of FOX Corporation, John Finley, Fox News Networks, LLC, Monica Mekeel, Jennifer Rauchet. (Yost, Kristina)
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FOX Corporation.(Lampe, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 19 FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FOX Corporation for Fox News Networks, LLC. Document filed by Fox News Networks, LLC.(Lampe, Matthew) Modified on 1/21/2020 (lb).
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Willis Lampe on behalf of FOX Corporation, John Finley, Fox News Networks, LLC, Monica Mekeel, Jennifer Rauchet. (Lampe, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Thomas A. Clare to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by George Murdoch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
January 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Thomas A. Clare to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Ariel V. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/7/2020) (jwh)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter, filed by Brittany McHenry. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks counsel for this letter and is satisfied that there is diversity of citizenship. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/7/2020) (jwh)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Ariel V. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18438851. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by George Murdoch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 VT Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Ariel)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas A. Clare to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18438806. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by George Murdoch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas) Modified on 1/7/2020 (wb).
January 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Thomas A. Clare to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18438806. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
January 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Ariel V. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18438851. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Arick Fudali dated January 6, 2020 re: Response to Court's Request Regarding Citizenship of Fox News Network, LLC (Dkt. # 9). Document filed by Brittany McHenry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fudali, Arick)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff Brittany McHenry and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendants News Corporation and Fox Entertainment Group. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Fox Entertainment Group and News Corporation terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/26/2019) (rro) Modified on 1/23/2020 (rro).
December 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt)
December 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Fox Entertainment Group, News Corporation. Document filed by Brittany McHenry. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Fudali, Arick)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court has reviewed plaintiffs complaint. Dkt. 1. To ensure that there is a basis for diversity jurisdiction, counsel are directed to a file a letter that lists the citizenship of each of the members of defendant Fox News Network, LLC, by January 6, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/16/2019) (va)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Bloom on behalf of Brittany McHenry. (Bloom, Sarah)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fudali, Arick)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against FOX Corporation, John Finley, Fox Entertainment Group, Fox News Networks, LLC, Monica Mekeel, George Murdoch, News Corporation, Jennifer Rauchet. Document filed by Brittany McHenry.(Fudali, Arick)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FOX Corporation, John Finley, Fox Entertainment Group, Fox News Networks, LLC, Monica Mekeel, George Murdoch, News Corporation, Jennifer Rauchet. (pne)
December 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Arick W. Fudali to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): MULTIPLE NATURE OF SUIT SELECTIONS MADE; REMOVE SELECTION OF 360 FROM CIVIL COVER SHEET. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
December 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
December 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Arick W. Fudali to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney (Arick W. Fudali). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fudali, Arick) Modified on 12/11/2019 (pne).
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against FOX Corporation, John Finley, Fox Entertainment Group, Fox News Networks, LLC, Monica Mekeel, George Murdoch, News Corporation, Jennifer Rauchet. Document filed by Brittany McHenry.(Fudali, Arick) Modified on 12/11/2019 (pne).
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FOX NEWS NETWORK, LLC; FOX CORPORATION; FOX ENTERTAINMENT GROUP; NEWS CORPORATION; GEORGE MURDOCH (a/k/a TYRUS); JENNIFER RAUCHET; JOHN FINLEY; MONICA MEKEEL, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany McHenry. (Fudali, Arick)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Brittany McHenry. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18252977)Document filed by Brittany McHenry.(Fudali, Arick) Modified on 12/11/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHenry v. Fox News Networks, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Mekeel
Represented By: Matthew Willis Lampe
Represented By: Kristina Ann Yost
Represented By: Maryssa Alexa Mataras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox News Networks, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Willis Lampe
Represented By: Kristina Ann Yost
Represented By: Maryssa Alexa Mataras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Murdoch
Represented By: Ariel Victoria Lieberman
Represented By: Thomas Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Finley
Represented By: Matthew Willis Lampe
Represented By: Kristina Ann Yost
Represented By: Maryssa Alexa Mataras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rauchet
Represented By: Matthew Willis Lampe
Represented By: Kristina Ann Yost
Represented By: Maryssa Alexa Mataras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOX Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Willis Lampe
Represented By: Kristina Ann Yost
Represented By: Maryssa Alexa Mataras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Entertainment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrus
Represented By: Ariel Victoria Lieberman
Represented By: Thomas Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany McHenry
Represented By: Arick W. Fudali
Represented By: Sarah Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?