De La Cruz v. AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. and AMERICAN EAGLE AIRLINES, INC.
Plaintiff: Aesha De La Cruz
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc., American Eagle Airlines, Inc. and AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11339
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 4/7/2020. Deposition due by 6/23/2020. Fact Discovery due by 8/7/2020. All expert discovery, including disclosures, reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by 12/18/2020. All Discovery due by 1/11/2011. This case is to be tried to a jury. Status Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/7/2020) (mro) Modified on 2/7/2020 (mro).
February 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/7/2020. (arc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alice Chan dated January 31, 2020 re: Joint Letter and Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., American Eagle Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Chan, Alice)
January 28, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by American Eagle Airlines, Inc..(Chan, Alice)
January 28, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint. Document filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC..(Chan, Alice)
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc. for American Eagle Airlines, Inc.. Document filed by American Eagle Airlines, Inc..(Chan, Alice)
January 28, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc. for AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. Document filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC..(Chan, Alice)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Application granted. The initial conference is adjourned to February 7, 2020 at 2:45 P.M. The parties shall file the joint letter and proposed case management plan by January 31, 2020. (Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 02:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/7/2020) (jwh)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alice Chan dated January 16, 2020. Document filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., American Eagle Airlines, Inc..(Chan, Alice)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order and Notice of Initial Conference served on Aesha De La Cruz/Law Office of James W. Bacher on January 15, 2020. Service was made by Mail and E-Mail. Document filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., American Eagle Airlines, Inc.. (Chan, Alice)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., American Eagle Airlines, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Aesha De La Cruz.(Bacher, James)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO DISCONTINUE AND AMEND COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the attorneys for the plaintiff and the attorneys for the defendant(s) in the above listed matter, that this action be amended to discontinue the cause of action against defendant, AMERICAN AlRLINES GROUP, INC., and to add AMERICAN AlRLINES, INC. and AMERICAN EAGLE AIRLINES. INC.. as defendants in the above-listed actions, and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. and American Eagle Airlines, Inc. added. American Airlines Group, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/7/2020) (jca)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Aesha De La Cruz. (Bacher, James)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/19/2019) (jca)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying as moot #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and denying as moot #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. In light of the fact that Defendant filed an Answer on December 18, 2019, the request for an extension is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at Dkts. 4 and 5. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/19/2019) (va)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by American Airlines Group, Inc..(Chan, Alice)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alice Chan dated December 18, 2019. Document filed by American Airlines Group, Inc..(Chan, Alice)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Alice Chan dated 12/16/2019. Document filed by American Airlines Group, Inc.. Return Date set for 12/18/2019 at 11:59 PM.(Chan, Alice)
December 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal With Attachments/Civil Cover Sheet served on Aesha De La Cruz/Law Office of James W. Bacher on 12/11/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Airlines Group, Inc.. (Chan, Alice)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Chan, Alice)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 32935/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18262651).Document filed by American Airlines Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - CT Corp Service Papers, #4 Exhibit D - Bacher Correspondence, #5 Exhibit E - Atlanta Medical Charges, #6 Exhibit F - Atlanta Medical Records, #7 Exhibit G - Charlotte Radiology Bills, #8 Exhibit H - NC Medical Record)(Chan, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Cruz v. AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. and AMERICAN EAGLE AIRLINES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Eagle Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aesha De La Cruz
Represented By: James William Bacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?