Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11470
Filed: December 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/4/2020) (gr)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 02/03/2020 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dt)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Garbarini, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/16/2019) (gr)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
December 14, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garbarini, Richard)
December 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard)
December 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard)
December 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18281041)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration, #2 Exhibit Assignment, #3 Exhibit Notice)(Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?