Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Thyssenkrupp North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11471
Filed: December 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from J. Brugh Lower dated January 31, 2020. Document filed by Thyssenkrupp North America, Inc...(Lower, Jonathon)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathon Brugh Lower on behalf of Thyssenkrupp North America, Inc...(Lower, Jonathon)
January 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Thyssenkrupp North America, Inc. served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. Service was accepted by Cathy Kreiger-Jewell, Registered Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard)
December 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #4 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct; The party listed in the Defendant section is not a party of record.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thyssenkrupp North America, Inc.. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 12/17/2019 (dnh).
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ThyssenKrupp North America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: THYSSENKRUPP NORTH AMERICA, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THYSSENKRUPP NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18281074)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration, #2 Exhibit Assignment, #3 Exhibit Notice)(Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Thyssenkrupp North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?