McGlynn v. Nylon Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: David McGlynn
Defendant: Nylon Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11520
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that by February 14, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, as outlined in the Court's December 20 initial pretrial conference order. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/13/2020) (cf)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Plaintiff's Proposed Plan and Letter Document filed by David McGlynn. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Letter).(Liebowitz, Richard)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. DENIED. The initial pretrial conference shall remain scheduled for February 19, 2020, at 12:40 p.m. The parties' joint letter and proposed case management plan shall remain due today. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/12/2020) (cf)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Richard Liebowitz dated February 12, 2020. Document filed by David McGlynn..(Liebowitz, Richard)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nylon Media, Inc. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Document filed by David McGlynn..(Liebowitz, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 12:40 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/20/2019) (cf)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/20/2019) (cf)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nylon Media, Inc.. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nylon Media, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David McGlynn. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nylon Media, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18292997)Document filed by David McGlynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlynn v. Nylon Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nylon Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McGlynn
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?